Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 77810
Short Caption:ESTATE OF MARY CURTIS VS. S. LAS VEGAS MED. INV'RS, LLCCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):79116, 79396
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A750520Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:01/07/2019 / Kunin, IsraelSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/04/2019Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Kolesar & Leatham. Check no. 5337. (SC)
01/04/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC)19-00614
01/04/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. (SC)19-00616
01/07/2019Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Israel Kunin. (SC).19-00879
01/24/2019Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for April 2, 2019, at 9:30 am. (SC).19-03840
01/24/2019Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC)19-03869
04/03/2019Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. (SC).19-14483
04/04/2019Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. (SC)19-14712
04/18/2019Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 10/31/18. To Court Reporter: Cynthia L. Georgilas. (SC)19-17171
05/22/2019TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Cynthia Georgilas stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 10/31/18. (SC)19-22464
07/05/2019Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: July 178, 2019. (SC)19-28667
07/16/2019BriefFiled Appellants' Opening Brief and Appendix (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED ON 07/17/19). (SC)
07/17/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Brief. Corrected Opening Brief and Appendix due: 5 days. (SC)19-30208
07/17/2019BriefFiled Appellants' Opening Brief. (SC)19-30233
07/17/2019AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix - Volume I. (SC)19-30236
07/17/2019AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix - Volume II. (SC)19-30239
08/15/2019Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance (Daniel Polsenberg, Joel Henriod and Abraham Smith as counsel for the Respondents). (SC).19-34341
08/15/2019MotionFiled Stipulation for Extenion to File Answering Brief. (SC).19-34343
08/15/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Respondents' Answering Brief due: September 16, 2019. (SC).19-34395
09/16/2019MotionFiled Respondents' Motion for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief. (SC)19-38688
09/25/2019MotionFiled Appellants' Notice of Non-Opposition to Respondents' Motion for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief. (SC)19-39910
10/10/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondents' Answering Brief due: October 16, 2019. (SC).19-41968
10/16/2019BriefFiled Respondents' Answering Brief. (SC)19-42981
11/15/2019BriefFiled Appellants' Reply Brief. (SC)19-47022
11/15/2019AppendixFiled Appellants' Supplemental Appendix - Volume I (SA313-323). (SC)19-47023
11/18/2019Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
03/25/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Firm Affiliation and Mailing Address (Michael Davidson). (SC).20-11457
04/24/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. (SC).20-15629
07/09/2020Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed in part, reversed in part, and remanded." Before: Gibbons/Stiglich/Silver. Author: Silver, J. Majority: Silver/Gibbons/Stiglich. 136 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 39. SNP20-MG/LS/AS (SC)20-25297
08/03/2020RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)20-28229
08/03/2020Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)