Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 77822
Short Caption:PERRY (PAULETTE) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):77822-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A779106Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:06/04/2019How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/07/2019Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
01/07/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement and Notice of Briefing Schedule mailed to counsel for appellant.)19-00888
01/11/2019Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals. (SC)19-01699
04/24/2019BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)19-17965
04/24/2019AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 1. (SC)19-17966
05/22/2019BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)19-22368
06/04/2019BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)19-24191
06/04/2019Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/Submitted For Decision. (SC)
09/12/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC)19-38234
09/12/2019Case Status UpdateTransferred to Court of Appeals. (SC)
12/11/2019Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Reversal and Remand. "ORDER the judgment of the district court REVERSED AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB. (SC).
01/06/2020Case Status UpdateTransferred from Court of Appeals. (SC)
01/06/2020RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)20-00560
01/06/2020Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
01/21/2020RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on January 9, 2020. (SC)20-00560