Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Combined Case Information: 77825 & 77825-COA
Short Caption:FRANKLIN VS. DIST. CT. (URGA)Court:Supreme Court & Court of Appeals
Related Case(s):77825-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A-15-779502-CClassification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Proper Person Writ Petition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/08/2019Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Bobby L. Franklin. Check no. 1218. (SC)
01/08/2019Petition/WritFiled Proper Person Petition for Writ. Notice of Petition and Petition for Writ of Mandamus. (SC)19-00984
01/11/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of . (SC)19-01764
01/11/2019Case Status UpdateTransferred to Court of Appeals. (SC)
01/11/2019Case Status UpdateTransferred from Supreme Court. (COA)
02/05/2019MotionFiled Proper Person Petitioner's Motion to Recuse Judge Jerome T. Tao From the Case. (THIS DOCUMENT TRANSFERRED TO SUPREME COURT PER ORDER FILED IN SUPREME COURT ON 3/26/19). (COA)
02/05/2019Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Petitioner's Notice of Standing. (COA)19-05538
03/26/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Petitioner has filed a motion in the Court of Appeals to disqualify Judge Tao from participating in the decision in this matter. NRS 1.225(4) provides that such motions be heard by the Supreme Court. Accordingly, the clerk of this court is directed to transfer the motion to disqualify Judge Tao filed on February 5, 2019, to the Supreme Court for resolution of the motion only. (SC)19-13325
03/26/2019MotionFiled Proper Person Petitioner's Motion to Recuse Judge Jerome T. Tao From the Case. (THIS DOCUMENT TRANSFERRED FROM COURT OF APPEALS TO SUPREME COURT PER ORDER FILED IN SUPREME COURT ON 3/26/19). (SC)19-13329
04/29/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. This matter was transferred to the court of appeals on January 11, 2019. Thereafter, petitioner filed a motion to disqualify Judge Tao, and the motion was transferred to this court for resolution. This court orders the motion denied. (SC)19-18606
05/02/2019Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. "We deny the petition." fn1[No action is required on petitioner's February 5, 2019, filing titled Notice of Standing.] Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB (COA)19-19377
05/02/2019Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. "We deny the petition." fn1[No action is required on petitioner's February 5, 2019, filing titled Notice of Standing.] Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB (SC)
05/28/2019Case Status UpdateTransferred to Supreme Court. (COA).
05/28/2019Case Status UpdateTransferred from Court of Appeals. (SC).
05/28/2019Case Status UpdateCase Closed. (COA).
05/28/2019RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. (SC).19-23030
05/28/2019Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC).
06/27/2019MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Ex Parte Motion to Stay Remittitur - Motion to Recall Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. (SC)19-27808
07/11/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Petitioner filed a motion to stay the remittitur, which this court construes as a motion to recall the notice in lieu of remittitur. The motion is denied. (SC).19-29487