Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 77836
Short Caption:JACKSON (MARLAND) VS. WARDENCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A778170Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Briefing Completed/Submitted For Decision
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:08/27/2019How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/09/2019Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
01/09/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)19-01213
01/16/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order to Enter Written Judgment or Order. District Court Order due: 60 days. (SC).19-02579
02/22/2019Order/IncomingFiled District court order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on February 22, 2019. Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Order. (SC)19-08402
03/01/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Transmission of Record and Regarding Briefing. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. Appellant's Opening Brief or Informal Brief due: 120 days. (SC)19-09464
03/07/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal - VOL 1. (SC)19-10239
03/07/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal - VOL 1. (SC)19-10240
03/12/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal pages 1 to 5 and 54 to 55 (SEALED). (SC)
03/12/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal pages 94 to 103 (SEALED). (SC)
07/02/2019Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document "Request for More Time." (SC).19-28427
07/12/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file the pro se brief received on July 5, 2019. fn1 [Contained within the brief is a request for appointment of counsel. Appellant is not entitled to appointed counsel at the state's expense in postconviction proceedings. Accordingly, the request is denied.] (SC).19-29810
07/12/2019BriefFiled Proper Person Appellant's Informal Brief. (SC).19-29811
08/27/2019Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/Submitted For Decision. (SC).