Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 77883
Short Caption:CLARK (RALPH) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):34575, 40941, 43621, 46807, 47692, 48343, 48660, 48747, 48776, 55775, 63879, 74415, 74415-COA, 76808, 76808-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C093713Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Briefing Completed/Submitted For Decision
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:07/15/2019How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/15/2019Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
01/15/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)19-02232
01/22/2019Order/IncomingFiled District court order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on 01/14/19. Order Denying Defendant's Motion for Modification of Sentence. (SC)19-03192
01/25/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Transmission of Record and Regarding Briefing. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. Appellant's Opening Brief or Informal Brief due: 120 days. (SC)19-04052
01/30/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volumes 1-10 (Via FTP). (SC)19-04739
02/05/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Pages 362-371 (SEALED). (SC)
02/05/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Pages 1055-1059, 1070-1072, 1078-1079, 1082-1086, 1091-1100, 1105, 1160-1167, 1176-1180, 1241-1245, 1355-1359, 1617-1621, 1788-1794 (SEALED). (SC)
05/31/2019BriefFiled Proper Person Appellant's Informal Brief. (SC)19-23768
07/15/2019Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/Submitted For Decision. No answering brief filed. (SC)