Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 77925
Short Caption:REID (RAFAEL) VS. STATE C/W 77924Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated:77924*, 77925Related Case(s):69362, 69362-COA, 77924
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C291082Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Briefing Completed/Submitted For Decision
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:07/15/2019How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/18/2019Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
01/18/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)19-02927
01/18/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. (Second NOA) (SC)19-02932
01/31/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Consolidating Appeals, Directing Transmission of Records, and Regarding Briefing. Records on Appeal due: 30 days. Appellant's Opening Brief or Informal Brief due: 120 days. Nos. 77924/77925. (SC)19-04939
02/22/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal (77925) - VOL 1. Nos. 77924/77925. (SC)19-08339
02/22/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal (77925) - VOL 2. Nos. 77924/77925. (SC)19-08340
02/22/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal (77924) (Related Case C291082) - VOL 1. Nos. 77924/77925. (SC)19-08341
02/22/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal (77924) (Related Case C291082) - VOL 2. Nos. 77924/77925. (SC)19-08359
02/22/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal (77924) (Related Case A778249) - VOL 1. Nos. 77924/77925. (SC)19-08343
03/04/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal - SEALED Pages (A778249) 86-155, 171-179, (C291082 & A778249) 166-175, and (C291082) 166-175. (3 envelopes). Nos. 77924/77925. (SC)
05/29/2019BriefFiled Proper Person Appellant's Informal Brief. Nos. 77924/77925. (SC)19-23247
07/15/2019Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/Submitted For Decision. No answering brief filed. Nos. 77924/77925. (SC)