Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 77949
Short Caption:BREWER (CORY) VS. WARDENCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR161320Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Briefing Completed/Submitted For Decision
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:07/15/2019How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/23/2019Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
01/23/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)19-03617
01/31/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order of Limited Remand for Appointment of Counsel. District Court Order due: 35 days. (SC)19-04893
02/07/2019Order/IncomingFiled District court order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on February 6, 2019. This matter is referred to Cotter Conway, Esq., Administrator of the Court Appointed Counsel for the selection of counsel for Appellant. (SC)19-05903
02/22/2019Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order Appointing Counsel. Filed certified copy of order filed in the district court on February 21, 2019 appointing Victoria Oldenburg as counsel for appellant. (SC)19-08313
02/26/2019MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Motion to Waive Appointment of Counsel or in the Alternative Able to File Secondary Brief (and Change of Address). (SC)19-08884
03/04/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion, Regarding Briefing, and Directing Transmission of Record on Appeal. This appeal shall proceed in pro se. Record on Appeal due: 30 days; Appellant's Opening Brief and Informal Brief due: 120 days. (SC).19-09580
03/07/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal - (VOL 1). (SC)19-10278
03/07/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal - (VOL 2). (SC)19-10280
03/07/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal - (VOL 3). (SC)19-10282
03/07/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal - (VOL 4). (SC)19-10287
03/12/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal - (VOL 5) (SEALED). (SC)
03/12/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Presentence Investigation Report (SEALED). (SC)
05/29/2019BriefFiled Proper Person Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC).19-23215
05/29/2019Notice/IncomingFiled Proper Person NRAP 26.1 Disclosure. (SC).19-23217
07/15/2019Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/Submitted For Decision. No answering brief filed. (SC)