Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Combined Case Information: 77965
Short Caption:LAS VEGAS METRO. POLICE DEP'T VS. THE CTR. FOR INVESTIGATIVE REPORTING, INC. C/W 77617Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated:77617*, 77965Related Case(s):77617
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A773883Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:En Banc Reconsider Filed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:Exempt
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:01/24/2020How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/24/2019Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. State/County/Municipality. (SC)
01/24/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC)19-03739
01/24/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. (SC)19-03741
01/25/2019Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Exemption from Settlement Program. It has been determined that this appeal will not be assigned to the settlement program. Appellant: 15 days transcript request form; 120 days opening brief. (SC).19-04016
01/30/2019Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC)19-04612
02/05/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Consolidating Appeals. Appellant shall have until April 26, 2019, to file and serve an appendix and a single opening brief addressing all issues in these appeals. Nos. 77617/77965. (SC)19-05570
04/25/2019Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: May 10, 2019. Nos. 77617/77965. (SC)19-18232
05/10/2019BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. Nos. 77617/77965. (SC)19-20606
05/10/2019AppendixFiled Joint Appendix, Volume 1. Nos. 77617/77965. (SC)19-20614
05/10/2019AppendixFiled Joint Appendix, Volume 2. Nos. 77617/77965. (SC)19-20622
05/10/2019AppendixFiled Joint Appendix, Volume 3. Nos. 77617/77965. (SC)19-20623
05/10/2019AppendixFiled Joint Appendix, Volume 4. Nos. 77617/77965. (SC)19-20626
05/13/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Due date: 10 days. (Joint Appendix). Nos. 77617/77965. (SC)19-20703
05/13/2019Notice/IncomingFiled Certificate of Service for Joint Appendix (Volumes 1-4). Nos. 77617/77965. (SC)19-20750
05/28/2019BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. Nos. 77617/77965. (SC)19-22935
06/14/2019MotionFiled Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief (First Request). Nos. 77617/77965. (SC)19-25965
06/17/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Appellant's Reply Brief due: July 29, 2019. Nos. 77617/77965 (SC)19-26071
07/29/2019BriefFiled Appellant LVMPD's Reply Brief. Nos. 77617/77965. (SC)19-31914
07/30/2019Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. Nos. 77617/77965. (SC)
11/22/2019BriefFiled Appellant LVMPD's Notice of Supplemental Authorities. Nos. 77617/77965. (SC)19-47892
01/24/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. Nos. 77617/77965(SC).20-03511
03/02/2020BriefFiled Respondent's Notice of Supplemental Authority Pursuant to NRAP 31(e). Nos. 77617/77965. (SC)20-08332
04/02/2020Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before the Southern Nevada Panel. Author: Silver, J. Majority: Gibbons/Stiglich. 136 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 15. SNP20-MG/LS/AS. Nos. 77617/77965. (SC).20-12548
04/20/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Rehearing. Nos. 77617/77965. (SC).20-14863
04/24/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Petition for Rehearing due: June 4, 2020. Nos. 77617/77965. (SC).20-15708
06/04/2020Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant, Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department's, Petition for Rehearing. Nos. 77617/77965. (SC)20-20969
07/01/2020Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). Nos. 77617/77965. (SC).20-24333
07/15/2020Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant, Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department's, Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. Nos. 77617/77965. (SC).Y20-26022