Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 77981
Short Caption:IN RE: FRASIER FAMILY TRUSTCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - PR1600128Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:06/24/2020How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/28/2019Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Doyle Law Office. Check no. 5231. (SC)
01/28/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC)19-04252
01/28/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Exemption from Settlement Program/File Documents. Transcript request due: 15 days. Opening brief due: 120 days. (SC)19-04254
02/13/2019Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 05/09/17, 10/17/17, 10/11/18, 10/12/18 To Court Reporter: A. Trevino, K. Murray, N. Hansen, R. Walker. (SC)19-06741
02/20/2019Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Docketing Statement due: March 5, 2019. (SC)19-07775
02/25/2019Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC)19-08416
03/06/2019TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Nicole J. Hansen stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 10/12/18. (SC)19-10139
03/06/2019TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Kate Murray stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 10/11/18. (SC)19-10141
03/06/2019TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Amy Jo Trevino stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 10/17/17. (SC)19-10142
05/16/2019Notice/IncomingFiled Respondent's Notice Suggestion of Death.19-21584
05/21/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Counsel for respondent Janie L. Mulrain has filed a suggestion of death informing this court that respondent Dinny Frasier passed away during the pendency of this litigation. Counsel's (for Dinny Frasier) Response due: 21 days. (SC)19-22230
05/28/2019Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: June 11, 2019. (SC).19-22958
06/07/2019Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondent Dinny Frasier's Response to this Court's Order Filed on May 21, 2019 due: June 25, 2019. (SC).19-24759
06/11/2019BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)19-25370
06/11/2019AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volumes 1-3. (SC)19-25371
06/11/2019AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volumes 4-6. (SC)19-25372
06/11/2019AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volumes 7-8. (SC)19-25373
06/11/2019AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volumes 9-10. (SC)19-25374
06/25/2019MotionFiled Respondent Dinny Frasier's Response to Order; and Request for Extension of Time. (SC)19-27296
07/03/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Counsel shall have until August 26, 2019, to (1) file a motion for the substitution of a personal representative; (2) inform this court whether additional time is required for the substitution of a personal representative; or (3) inform this court that Ms. Frasier has no personal representative. (SC).19-28493
07/10/2019MotionFiled Respondent Dinny Frasier's Motion for Extension of Time to File its Answering Brief (First Request). (SC)19-29348
08/07/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion and to File Documents. The personal representative of respondent Dinny Frasier shall have until September 9, 2019, to file and serve the answering brief. To date, respondents Premier Trust, Inc.; Janie Mulrain; Nori Frasier; and Bradley Frasier have failed to file their answering briefs, which were due to be filed on or before July 11, 2019. These respondents shall have 14 days from the date of this order to file and serve the answering briefs. (SC).19-33294
08/15/2019BriefFiled Respondent Premier Trust's Answering Brief. (SC)19-34448
08/26/2019MotionFiled Respondent's Motion for Substitution of Personal Representative of Dinny Frasier Pursuant to NRAP 43(a)(1). (SC)19-35607
08/26/2019BriefFiled Proper Person Respondent Bradley L. Frasier, M.D.'s Answering Brief. (SC)19-35629
09/04/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Substituting Personal Representative. The clerk of this court shall substitute Stanley H. Brown, Jr. as the personal representative of respondent Dinny Frasier, and shall amend the caption in this appeal to conform to the caption on this order. Mr. Brown shall have until September 9, 2019, to file and serve an answering brief. Appellant shall have 30 days from service of Mr. Brown's answering brief to file and serve a reply brief, if deemed necessary. This appeal will be resolved without an answering brief from respondents Janie Mulrain and Nori Frasier. (SC)19-36836
09/09/2019BriefFiled Respondent Dinny Frasier's Answering Brief. (SC).19-37726
09/09/2019AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief - Volume 1. (SC).19-37727
09/09/2019AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief - Volume 2. (SC).19-37729
09/12/2019Notice/IncomingFiled Janie Mulrain's Joinder to Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)19-38303
10/09/2019MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Strike Bradley L. Frasier, M.D.'s Answering Brief. (SC)19-41781
10/09/2019MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Reply Brief. (SC)19-41782
11/21/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant has filed a motion to strike the answering brief of pro se respondent Bradley L. Frasier. The motion to strike is denied. Appellant's Reply Brief due: 21 days. (SC).19-47686
12/11/2019MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Reply Brief. (SC)19-50268
12/18/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Reply Brief due: January 2, 2020. (SC)19-51244
01/02/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC).20-00192
01/03/2020Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC).
04/16/2020AppendixFiled Appendix Amended Volume 5. (SC).20-14542
04/16/2020AppendixFiled Appendix Amended Volume 6. (SC).20-14638
06/24/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. (SC)20-23402
08/27/2020Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed in part, reversed in part, and remanded with instructions." Before: Parraguirre/Hardesty/Cadish. Author: Hardesty, J. Majority: Hardesty/Parraguirre/Cadish. 136 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 56. NNP20-RP/JH/EC. (SC).20-31554
09/21/2020RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC).20-34576
09/21/2020Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC).