Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 77984
Short Caption:ROBERTS (JOSHUA) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):76103, 77984-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C317965Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Transferred to Court of Appeals
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:06/12/2019How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/28/2019Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
01/28/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)19-04314
02/11/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Filing of Brief. Order Directing Transmission of Record. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. Within 120 days, appellant may file either (1) a brief that complies with the requirements in NRAP 28(a) and NRAP 32; or (2) the "Informal Brief Form for Pro Se Parties" provided by the supreme court clerk. NRAP 31(a)(1). If no brief is submitted, the appeal may be decided on the record on appeal. (SC).19-06373
02/20/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal - VOL 1. (SC)19-07987
02/26/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal (PSI) Pages 1-8 (SEALED). (SC)
04/15/2019BriefFiled Proper Person Appellant's Informal Brief. (SC)19-16440
05/17/2019MotionFiled Respondent Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department's Motion to Extend Time for Filing Answering Brief (First Request). (SC)19-21793
05/22/2019BriefFiled Respondent Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department's Answering Brief. (SC)19-22354
06/03/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The motion for an extension of time to file the answering brief is granted. The answering brief was filed on May 22, 2019. Appellant shall have until June 21, 2019, to file a reply brief, if deemed necessary. (SC)19-23945
06/07/2019MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Motion for Leave to File a Reply, Reply and Other Relief. (SC) (DETACHED REPLY BRIEF FROM MOTION AND FILED SEPARATELY PER 06/12/19 ORDER).19-24833
06/12/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall detach the reply brief attached to the motion filed on June 7, 2019, and file it separately. (SC).19-25404
06/12/2019BriefFiled Proper Person Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC).19-25405
06/12/2019Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/Submitted For Decision. (SC).
09/19/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC)19-39120
09/19/2019Case Status UpdateTransferred to Court of Appeals. (SC)