Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Combined Case Information: 77993
Short Caption:PICKENS VS. LA VILLA VEGAS, INC.Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A711680Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:02/05/2019 / Segel, M.SP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:02/26/2021How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/29/2019Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
01/29/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)19-04508
01/29/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)19-04511
01/29/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Civil. Due date: 10 days. (SC)19-04513
01/29/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. (SC)19-04518
02/01/2019Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Millennium Legal. Check no. 1557. (SC)
02/01/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 20 days. (SC).19-05209
02/05/2019Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: M. Nelson Segel. (SC).19-05579
02/25/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellants' Case Appeal Statement and Docketing Statement due: 10 days. (SC).19-08603
02/27/2019Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for April 30, 2019, at 9:00 am. (SC).19-08953
03/08/2019Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC)19-10447
03/08/2019Docketing StatementFiled Additional Documents for Docketing Statement, Vol. II. (SC)19-10470
04/01/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant's Case Appeal Statement due: 10 days. (SC)19-14100
04/19/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Imposing Conditional Sanctions and Directing Appellants to File Case Appeal Statement. Conditional sanction of $ 500 due: 15 days or Case Appeal Statement due: 10 days. (SC)19-17288
04/30/2019Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: May 21, 2019, at 9:00 am. (SC).19-18892
05/02/2019Transcript RequestFiled Request For Transcript of Proceedings: None. (SC)19-19372
05/02/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. (SC)19-19374
05/28/2019Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The Settlement Judge is optimistic that the matter can be resolved, but requires the participation of a third party. A further status report will be filed once it is determined whether the matter can move forward. (SC).19-23046
09/04/2019Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. A request is made to extend the date to complete this matter until November 29, 2019. (SC)19-37006
09/06/2019Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Settlement Judge's Final Settlement Program Status Report due: November 29, 2019. (SC).19-37425
10/14/2019Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. (SC)19-42492
10/17/2019Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. Appellants: 45 days opening brief and appendix. (SC).19-43030
12/02/2019MotionFiled Appellants' Motion for Extension (Opening Brief and Appendix). (SC)19-48665
12/03/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Appellants' Opening Brief and Appendix due: January 2, 2020. (SC)19-48865
01/02/2020MotionFiled Appellants' Motion for Extension (Opening Brief and Appendix). (SC).20-00187
01/09/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellants' Opening Brief and Appendix due: February 3, 2020. (SC).20-01089
02/03/2020MotionFiled Appellants' Motion for Extension (Opening Brief and Appendix). (SC)20-04670
02/13/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellants' Opening Brief and Appendix due: March 4, 2020. (SC).20-06117
03/24/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order to File Documents. Appellants shall have 14 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. (SC)20-11364
04/07/2020AppendixFiled Appellants' Supplemental Authorities. (SC)20-13092
04/07/2020AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix., Vol. 1. (SC)20-13098
04/07/2020AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix., Vol. 2, part 1. (SC)20-13099
04/07/2020AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix., Vol. 3, part 1. (SC)20-13101
04/07/2020AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix., Vol. 4, part 1. (SC)20-13107
04/07/2020MotionFiled Appellants' Fourth Motion for Extension (Opening Brief and Appendix). (SC)20-13111
04/07/2020AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix, Vol. 5 in 4 parts, Part 1. (SC)20-13116
04/07/2020AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix, Vol. 6 in 2 parts, Part . (SC)20-13117
04/07/2020AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix, Vol. 7 in 3 parts, Part 1. (SC)20-13120
04/07/2020AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix, Vol. 8 in 2 parts, Part 1. (SC)20-13122
04/09/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellants' Opening Brief due: April 14, 2020. (SC).20-13576
04/17/2020BriefFiled Appellants' Opening Brief. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 04/17/20). (SC)
04/17/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document. Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)20-14842
04/17/2020MotionFiled Appellants' Motion to Exceed Page Limit. (SC)20-14837
04/22/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Fifth Motion for Extension of Time, or in alternative, Motion for Untimely Filing (Opening Brief and Appendix). (SC).20-15228
04/24/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Regarding Motions. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: 7 days. Appellant's motion for leave to file an opening brief in excess of 30 pages is denied as moot. Appellant indicates that the brief is within the type/volume limitation. See NRAP 32(a)(7)(B)(i) and (ii). (SC).20-15711
05/07/2020MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Time for Answering Brief. (SC)20-17357
05/19/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellants shall have 7 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief. Respondents shall have 60 days from the date the opening brief is filed to file and serve the answering brief. (SC)20-19020
05/19/2020BriefFiled Opening Brief of Appellants (REJECTED PER 05/20/20 NOTICE). (SC).
05/20/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Rejection of Deficient Brief. Corrected brief due: 5 days. (Opening Brief). (SC).20-19172
05/22/2020BriefFiled Appellants' Opening Brief. (SC).20-19622
07/20/2020MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Time for Answering Brief. (SC)20-26421
07/31/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondents shall have until September 8, 2020, to file and serve the answering brief. (SC)20-28061
08/06/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Firm and Address of Attorney Steven Marzullo. (SC)20-29047
09/03/2020BriefFiled Respondents' Answering Brief. (SC)20-32601
10/27/2020Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. No reply brief filed. (SC)
02/26/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. (SC)21-05676
04/29/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP21 - EC/KP/DH (SC)21-12365
05/26/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC).21-15025
05/26/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC).
06/18/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on May 27, 2021. (SC)21-15025