Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 78012
Short Caption:MOORE, JR. (HERBIE) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):63389, 65818
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C267463Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:CadishCase Status:Briefing Completed/Submitted For Decision
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:06/12/2019How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
02/01/2019Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
02/01/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)19-05037
02/01/2019OtherJustice Elissa Cadish disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Sat in District Court Proceedings. (SC)
02/11/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Entry and Transmission of Written Order. District Court Order due: 60 days. (SC)19-06347
03/26/2019Order/IncomingFiled District court order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on March 25, 2019. Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Order. (SC)19-13379
04/02/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Filing of Brief. Order Directing Transmission of Record. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. Within 120 days, appellant may file either (1) a brief that complies with the requirements in NRAP 28(a) and NRAP 32; or (2) the "Informal Brief Form for Pro Se Parties" provided by the supreme court clerk. NRAP 31(a)(1). If no brief is submitted, the appeal may be decided on the record on appeal. (SC).19-14425
04/24/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal - Volumes 1-13 (via FTP). (SC)19-18067
04/26/2019BriefFiled Proper Person Appellant's Informal Brief. (SC)19-18500
04/29/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. (Second NOA) (SC)19-18592
04/29/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal (PSI) Pages 373-379 (SEALED). (SC)
04/29/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal (Supp PSI) Pages 395-401 (SEALED). (SC)
06/12/2019Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/Submitted For Decision. (SC)