Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 78016
Short Caption:GRAY (MALCOLM) VS. WARDEN C/W 78015Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated:78015*, 78016Related Case(s):78015, 78015-COA, 78016-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A775679Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Transferred to Court of Appeals
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:06/27/2019How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
02/01/2019Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
02/01/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)19-05070
02/01/2019Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance (Erica F. Berrett as counsel for the Respondent). (SC).19-05080
02/11/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Consolidating Appeals, Directing Transmission of Records, and Regarding Briefing. In the interest of judicial economy, these appeals are consolidated. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. Within 120 days, appellant may file either (1) a brief that complies with the requirements in NRAP 28(a) and NRAP 32; or (2) the "Informal Brief Form for Pro Se Parties" provided by the supreme court clerk. NRAP 31(a)(1). If no brief is submitted, the appeal may be decided on the record on appeal. Nos. 78015/78016. (SC).19-06367
02/21/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal - Volume 1. Nos. 78015/78016 (A18775679W) (SC)19-08093
02/21/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal - Volume 1. Nos. 78015/78016 (A18773980W).(SC)19-08135
06/27/2019Case Status UpdateSubmitted for Decision. Nos. 78015/78016. (SC)
09/19/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. Nos. 78015/78016. (SC)19-39116
09/19/2019Case Status UpdateTransferred to Court of Appeals. Nos. 78015/78016. (SC)