Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 78026
Short Caption:COLLINS (MARK) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):63754, 64433, 67006, 68233, 68233-COA, 68559, 68559-COA, 69222, 69222-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C244013Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Briefing Completed/Submitted For Decision
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:08/12/2019How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
02/01/2019Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
02/01/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)19-05127
02/11/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Filing of Brief. Order Directing Transmission of Record. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. Within 120 days, appellant may file either (1) a brief that complies with the requirements in NRAP 28(a) and NRAP 32; or (2) the "Informal Brief Form for Pro Se Parties" provided by the supreme court clerk. NRAP 31(a)(1). If no brief is submitted, the appeal may be decided on the record on appeal. (SC).19-06372
02/15/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volumes 1-7 (Via FTP). (SC)19-07193
02/20/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Pages 431-434, 943-949, 1074-1080, 1271-1275, 1457-1460 (SEALED). (SC)
02/20/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal (PSI) Pages 805-815 (SEALED). (SC)
06/11/2019MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Opening Brief. (SC)19-25186
06/28/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file the pro se opening brief received on June 27, 2019. (SC).19-27843
06/28/2019BriefFiled Proper Person Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC).19-27845
07/10/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal - SEALED Pages 191-201, Presentence Investigation Report. (SC)
07/26/2019Notice/IncomingFiled Proper Person Appellant's Notice of Address Change. (SC)19-31613
08/12/2019Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/Submitted For Decision. (SC)