Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 78055
Short Caption:DURAN (VICKIE) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A780934Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Briefing Completed/Submitted For Decision
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:07/15/2019How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
02/05/2019Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
02/05/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)19-05466
02/19/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Transmission of Record and Regarding Briefing. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. Appellant's Opening Brief or Informal Brief due: 120 days. (SC)19-07555
02/21/2019Transcript RequestFiled Proper Person Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: All. To Court Reporter: None listed.19-08179
03/06/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal - Volume 1. (SC)19-10032
03/06/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal - Volume 2. (SC)19-10033
03/06/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volumes 1-7 (Via FTP). (SC)19-10037
03/12/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal pages 122 to 124 (SEALED). (SC)
03/12/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Pre-sentence Investigation Report pages 152 thru 159 (SEALED). (SC)
03/12/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal pages 1050 to 1056 and 1334 to 1339 (SEALED). (SC)
03/20/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order. This court declines to order the preparation of the requested transcripts at this time. However, as this appeal proceeds, this court will consider the necessity of transcripts and may order their preparation at a later date. (SC)19-12284
05/28/2019BriefFiled Proper Person Appellant's Informal Brief. (SC).19-23122
07/15/2019Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/Submitted For Decision. No answering brief filed. (SC)