Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 78063
Short Caption:PEREZ-MARQUEZ (OSCAR) VS. STATE, DEP'T OF CORR.Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A777798Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Briefing Completed/Submitted For Decision
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:07/05/2019How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
02/05/2019Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
02/05/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)19-05587
02/19/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Entry and Transmission of Written Order. Due: 60 days. (SC)19-07548
02/25/2019Order/IncomingFiled District court order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on February 25, 2019. Decision and Order. (SC)19-08489
03/01/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Transmission of Record and Regarding Briefing. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. Appellant's Opening Brief or Informal Brief due: 120 days. (SC)19-09466
03/04/2019Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance (Allison Herr as counsel for Respondents). (SC)19-09609
03/11/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal - VOL 1. (SC)19-10673
05/20/2019BriefFiled Proper Person Appellant's Informal Brief. (SC)19-22020
07/05/2019Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/Submitted For Decision. (SC)