Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 78085
Short Caption:NALDER VS. DIST. CT. (UNITED AUTO. INS. CO.) C/W 78243Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated:78085*, 78243Related Case(s):70504, 78243, 79487, 80965
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A549111, A772220Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus
Disqualifications:Case Status:En Banc Reconsider Filed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:01/24/2020How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
02/07/2019Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $250.00 from David A. Stephens. (SC)
02/07/2019Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus. (SC)19-05986
02/08/2019AppendixFiled Petitioners' Appendix Volume 1. (SC)19-06021
02/11/2019Notice/IncomingFiled - Amended Certificate of Service - Petition for Writ of Mandamus and Appendix. (SC)19-06390
02/27/2019AppendixFiled Petitioner's Errata to Appendix. (SC)19-08971
03/14/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer. Real party in interest, on behalf of respondents, shall have 28 days from the date of this order to file and serve an answer, including authorities, against issuance of the requested writ. Thereafter, petitioners shall have 14 days from service of the answer to file and serve any reply. (SC)19-11397
04/11/2019MotionFiled Real Party in Interest's Motion for Extension to File Answer. (SC).19-16031
04/12/2019Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance (Daniel Polsenberg, Joel Henriod and Abraham Smith). (SC).19-16096
04/25/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Real Party in Interest's Answer to Petition for Writ due: June 10, 2019. (SC).19-18139
06/10/2019MotionFiled Real Party in Interest United Automobile Insurance Company's Motion for Extension to File Answer. (SC)19-25125
06/19/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Real party in interest shall have until July 10, 2019, to file and serve the answer. Petitioners shall have 14 days from service of the answer to file and serve any reply. (SC)19-26477
07/10/2019AppendixFiled Real Party in Interest United Auto Ins. Co.'s Appendix Volume 1. (SC)19-29346
07/10/2019AppendixFiled Real Party in Interest United Auto Ins. Co.'s Appendix Volume 2. (SC)19-29347
07/10/2019AppendixFiled Real Party in Interest United Auto Ins. Co.'s Appendix Volume 3. (SC)19-29349
07/10/2019AppendixFiled Real Party in Interest United Auto Ins. Co.'s Appendix Volume 4. (SC)19-29350
07/10/2019AppendixFiled Real Party in Interest United Auto Ins. Co.'s Appendix Volume 5. (SC)19-29351
07/10/2019AppendixFiled Real Party in Interest United Auto Ins. Co.'s Appendix Volume 6. (SC)19-29352
07/10/2019AppendixFiled Real Party in Interest United Auto Ins. Co.'s Appendix Volume 7. (SC)19-29353
07/10/2019AppendixFiled Real Party in Interest United Auto Ins. Co.'s Appendix Volume 8. (SC)19-29355
07/10/2019AppendixFiled Real Party in Interest United Auto Ins. Co.'s Appendix Volume 9. (SC)19-29356
07/10/2019AppendixFiled Real Party in Interest United Auto Ins. Co.'s Appendix Volume 10. (SC)19-29357
07/10/2019AppendixFiled Real Party in Interest United Auto Ins. Co.'s Appendix Volume 11. (SC)19-29358
07/10/2019AppendixFiled Real Party in Interest United Auto Ins. Co.'s Appendix Volume 12. (SC)19-29359
07/10/2019Petition/WritFiled Real Party in Interest United Automobile Insurance Company's Answer to Petition for Writ. (SC)19-29395
07/25/2019MotionFiled Stipulation for Extension to File Reply Brief. (SC)19-31530
07/30/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Approving Stipulation. Petitioners' Reply due August 26, 2019. (SC)19-32113
08/26/2019Petition/WritFiled Petitioners' Reply to Answer to Petition for Writ of Mandamus. (SC)19-35711
01/24/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. Nos. 78085/78243. (SC).20-03512
04/30/2020Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Petitions granted in part and denied in part." Before: Stiglich/Gibbons/Silver. 136 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 24. SNP20-MG/LS/AS Nos. 78085/78243. (SC)20-16341
04/30/2020WritIssued Writ with letter. Original and one copy of writ and copy of opinion mailed to attorney David A. Stephens and Thomas Christensen for service upon Judge David M. Jones and Judge Eric Johnson. Nos. 78243/78085. (SC)20-16478
05/18/2020MotionFiled Petitioner's Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs and for Reconsideration. Nos. 78085/78243. (SC)20-18932
05/19/2020WritFiled Returned Writ. Original Writ returned. Served on Judge David Jones on 5/11/2020. Nos.78085/78243. (SC)20-19106
05/26/2020MotionFiled Real Party in Interest's Opposition to Petitoners' "Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs and for Reconsideration." Nos. 78085/78243. (SC)20-19903
07/01/2020Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). Nos. 78085/78243. (SC).20-24335
07/14/2020Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petitioner Gary Lewis's Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. Nos. 78085/78243. (SC).Y20-25923