Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 78086
Short Caption:J.E. JOHNS & ASSOCS. VS. LINDBERGCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV1500281Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Rehearing Filed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:Exempt
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:05/29/2020How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
02/08/2019Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Glade L. Hall. Check no. 1471. (SC)
02/08/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC)19-06028
02/08/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. (SC)19-06030
02/08/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Minutes (SEALED). (SC)
02/11/2019Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Exemption from Settlement Program. It has been determined that this appeal will not be assigned to the settlement program. Appellant: 15 days transcript request form; 120 days opening brief. (SC).19-06268
02/28/2019Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Cross-Appeal. Filing fee will be forwarded by the District Court. (SC)
02/28/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Cross-Appeal. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for cross-appellant.) (SC)19-09200
02/28/2019Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Moore Law Group. Check no. 1602. (Cross-Appeal) (SC)
03/01/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Minutes (SEALED). (SC)
03/07/2019Docketing StatementFiled Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Docketing Statement. (SC)19-10348
03/15/2019Transcript RequestFiled Respondents/Cross-Appellant's Certificate That No Transcript is Being Requested. (SC)19-11622
03/19/2019MotionFiled Appellant/Cross-Respondents' Motion for Extension of Time (Transcript Request). (SC)19-12090
03/19/2019Transcript RequestFiled Appellant/Cross-Respondents' Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 08/20/18, 08/21/18, 08/22/18. To Court Reporter: Joan Dotson. (REJECTED PER ORDER 3/26/19). (SC)19-12091
03/21/2019Docketing StatementFiled Respondent/Cross-Appellants' Docketing Statement Civil Appeals (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED ON 3/21/19). (SC)
03/21/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document (Respondent/Cross-Appellants' Docketing Statement). (SC)19-12677
03/21/2019MotionFiled Respondent/Cross-Appellants' Motion for Extension of Time to File Docketing Statement. (SC)19-12737
03/21/2019Docketing StatementFiled Respondent/Cross-Appellants' Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC)19-12738
03/26/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Respondents/cross-appellants' motion for an extension of time to file their docketing statement is granted. The docketing statement was filed on March 21, 2019. Appellants/cross-respondents' motion for an extension of time to file the transcript request form is granted. However, the transcript request form filed on March 19, 2019, does not comply with NRAP 9(a)(3)(A) because it does not bear the file-stamp of the district court clerk. Appellants/cross-respondents shall have 5 days from the date of this order to file and serve a transcript request form that fully complies with NRAP 9(a). (SC)19-13264
04/05/2019Transcript RequestFiled Appellant/Cross-Respondents' Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 08/20/18, 08/21/18, 08/22/18. To Court Reporter: Joan Dotson. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED ON 04/08/19). (SC)
04/08/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document (Appellant/Cross-Respondents' Request for Transcript of Proceedings). (SC)19-15068
04/15/2019TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Joan Marie Dotson stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 8/20/18 through 8/22/18. (SC)19-16478
06/11/2019Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellants/Cross-Respondents' Opening Brief and Appendix due: June 25, 2019. (SC)19-25273
06/25/2019BriefFiled Appellant/Cross-Respondents' Opening Brief. (SC)19-27393
06/25/2019AppendixFiled Appellant/Cross-Respondents' Appendix Volume I. (SC)19-27395
06/25/2019AppendixFiled Appellant/Cross-Respondents' Appendix Volume II. (SC)19-27396
06/25/2019AppendixFiled Appellant/Cross-Respondents' Appendix Volume III. (SC)19-27397
07/16/2019Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Answering Brief on Appeal and Opening Brief on Cross-Appeal due: August 8, 2019. (SC)19-30023
08/08/2019BriefFiled Respondent/Cross-Appellants' Answering Brief and Opening Brief on Cross-Appeal. (SC)19-33390
08/08/2019AppendixFiled Respondent/Cross-Appellants' Appendix - Volume I. (SC)19-33399
08/08/2019AppendixFiled Respondent/Cross-Appellants' Appendix - Volume II. (SC)19-33400
08/08/2019AppendixFiled Respondent/Cross-Appellants' Appendix - Volume III. (SC)19-33401
08/20/2019MotionFiled Nevada Realtors' Motion for Leave to File an Amicus Brief. (SC)19-34848
08/27/2019MotionFiled Respondent/Cross-Appellants' Opposition to Nevada Realtors' Motion for Leave to File an Amicus Brief. (SC)19-35750
09/09/2019Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellants/Cross-Respondents' Reply Brief due: September 23, 2019. (SC).19-37692
09/24/2019MotionFiled Appellant/Cross-Respondents' Motion for Extension of Time (Reply Brief and Answering Brief on Cross Appeal). (SC)19-39739
09/24/2019BriefFiled Appellant/Cross-Respondents' Reply Brief and Answering Brief on Cross Appeal. (SC)19-39740
09/30/2019MotionFiled Respondent/Cross-Appellants' Non-Opposition to Appellant/Cross-Respondents' Motion for Extension of Time. (SC)19-40561
10/10/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Nevada REALTORS® have filed an untimely motion for leave to file a brief of amicus curiae in support of appellants/cross-respondents. The untimely motion is denied. The clerk shall return the proposed brief of amicus curiae and appendix received on August 20 and 23, 2019, unfiled. Cause appearing, and notwithstanding its untimeliness, appellants/cross-respondents' motion for an extension of time to file the combined reply brief on appeal and answering brief on cross-appeal is granted. The combined brief was filed on September 24, 2019. Appellants/cross-respondents shall have 7 days from the date of this order to file and serve an amended certificate of compliance. Respondents/cross-appellants shall have until October 24, 2019, to file and serve any reply brief on cross-appeal. (SC).19-41956
10/17/2019BriefFiled Appellant/Cross-Respondents' Amended Reply Brief and Answering Brief on Cross Appeal (Corrected Certificate of Compliance). (SC).19-43062
10/22/2019Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondent/Cross-Appellants' Reply Brief on Cross-Appeal due: November 7, 2019. (SC).19-43701
11/01/2019BriefFiled Respondents' Reply Brief on Cross-Appeal. (SC)19-45081
11/04/2019Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
04/23/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Attorney John Moore's Notice of Change of Address. (SC)20-15441
05/29/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. (SC)20-20371
08/20/2020Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before: Parraguirre/Hardesty/Cadish. Author: Hardesty, J. Majority: Hardesty/Parraguirre/Cadish. 136 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 55. NNP20-RP/JH/EC. (SC).20-30683
09/08/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. (Lynn Rivera for Appellants/Cross-Respondents) (SC)20-32974
09/08/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Association of Counsel. Lynn Rivera of Burnham Brown appearing as co-counsel for appellants/cross-respondents. (SC)20-33066
09/09/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's Petition for Rehearing Due: September 22, 2020. (SC)20-33139
09/21/2020Petition/BarFiled Appellant/Cross-Respondent Petition for Rehearing (REJECTED PER NOTICE ON 9/22/2020) (SC)
09/22/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Rejection for Rehearing Petition. Filing fee was not submitted with petition. (SC)20-34775
09/22/2020Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant/Cross-Appellant's Petition for Rehearing (SC)Y20-34848
09/22/2020Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $150.00 from Lynn V. Rivera (SC)