Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 78103
Short Caption:LUND (MICHAEL) VS. STATE, DEP'T OF CORR.Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A782377Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Submitted for Decision
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:07/26/2019How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
02/13/2019Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
02/13/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)19-06763
02/19/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order to Enter Written Judgment or Order. District Court Order due: 60 days. (SC).19-07534
02/22/2019Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance of Counsel (Allison Herr for Respondents). (SC)19-08403
02/26/2019Notice/IncomingFiled Proper Person Notice of Change of Address. (SC)19-08878
03/04/2019Order/IncomingFiled District court order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on March 4, 2019. Decision and Order. (SC)19-09622
03/11/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Transmission of Record and Regarding Briefing. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. Appellant's Opening Brief and Informal Brief due: 120 days. (SC)19-10712
03/22/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal - Volume 1. (SC)19-12784
07/26/2019Case Status UpdateSubmitted for Decision. (SC)