Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 78113
Short Caption:HARRIS (MARIANN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):64913
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C275959Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:SilverCase Status:Screening Completed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
02/14/2019Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
02/14/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC)19-07006
02/14/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Criminal. Due date: 10 days (SC)19-07013
02/15/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. (SC)19-07228
02/19/2019OtherJustice Abbi Silver disqualified from participation in this matter. (SC)
03/01/2019Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 09/02/11; Renee Vincent; 09/08/11, 10/06/11, 11/01/11, 11/03/11, 02/12/13, 02/14/13, 07/18/13, 09/23/13, 01/22/14, 10/12/17, 12/14/17, 12/19/17, 02/08/18, 03/15/18, 06/26/18; Matt Yarbrough; 07/12/12, 06/27/13, 09/19/13, 02/04/14; Renee Silvaggio; 10/02/13; Yvette Sison; 09/23/13; Matt Yarbrough; 03/03/16, 03/24/16, 05/05/16, 01/12/17, 05/11/17, 07/13/17; Dalyne Easley; 07/26/18, 10/25/18, 12/13/18, 01/22/19; Melissa Murphy-Delgado. To Court Reporter: Renee Vincent; Matt Yarbrough; Yvette Sison; Dalyne Easley; Renee Silvaggio and Melissa Murphy. (SC)19-09452
03/04/2019Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals. (SC)19-09566
03/29/2019TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Robin Page stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 10/12/17, 12/14/17, 12/19/17, 02/08/18, 03/15/18 and 06/26/18. (SC)19-13992
06/13/2019TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Melissa Delgado-Murphy stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 07/26/18,10/25/18, 12/13/18 and 01/22/19. (SC)19-25747
06/14/2019MotionFiled Stipulation (Opening Brief). (SC)19-25794
06/14/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Appellant's Opening Brief due: July 15, 2019. (SC)19-25847
07/12/2019Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 09/23/13. To Court Reporter: JoAnn Melendez. (SC)19-29843
07/15/2019MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time Due to Need for Trial Transcript (Opening Brief). (SC)19-29957
07/25/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: August 29, 2019. (SC)19-31444
08/29/2019MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for One Day Extension of Time to File Opening Brief. (SC)19-36340
08/30/2019AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume I. (SC)19-36396
08/30/2019AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume II. (SC)19-36401
08/30/2019AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume III. (SC)19-36402
08/30/2019AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume IV. (SC)19-36404
08/30/2019AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume V. (SC)19-36408
08/30/2019AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume VI. (SC)19-36411
08/30/2019AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume VII. (SC)19-36417
08/30/2019AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume VIII. (SC)19-36419
08/30/2019AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume IX. (SC)19-36421
08/30/2019AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume X. (SC)19-36422
08/30/2019AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume XI. (SC)19-36424
08/30/2019AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume XII. (SC)19-36426
08/30/2019AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume XIII. (SC)19-36429
08/30/2019AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume XIV. (SC)19-36431
08/30/2019AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume XV. (SC)19-36434
08/30/2019AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume XVI. (SC)19-36437
08/30/2019AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume XVII. (SC)19-36438
08/30/2019AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume XVIII. (SC)19-36441
08/30/2019AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume XIX. (SC).19-36589
08/30/2019BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC).19-36616
09/10/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The opening brief and appendix were filed on August 30, 2019. Respondent shall have until September 30, 2019, to file and serve the answering brief. (SC)19-37762
09/30/2019MotionFiled Respondent's Motion for Enlargement of Time. (SC)19-40451
10/10/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent's Answering Brief due: December 2, 2019. (SC).19-41971
12/02/2019BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)19-48663
12/24/2019MotionFiled Stipulation (Reply Brief). (SC)19-52040
12/24/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Appellant's Reply Brief due: February 3, 2020. (SC)19-52109
02/03/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)20-04700
02/04/2020Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)