Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 78140
Short Caption:GONZALEZ (ALFRED) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):71897, 75100, 75100-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Nye Co. - Fifth Judicial District - CR8231AClassification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Briefing Completed/Submitted For Decision
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:08/02/2019How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
02/20/2019Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
02/20/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)19-07856
04/02/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Transmission of Record and Regarding Briefing. Record on Appeal due: 30 days; Appellant's Opening Brief or Informal Brief due: 120 days. (SC)19-14424
04/08/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal (CR 8231) Volume 1. (SC)19-15094
04/08/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal (CR 8231) Volume 2. (SC)19-15096
04/08/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal (PC 8231) Volume 1. (SC)19-15102
04/08/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Letter. (SC)19-15103
06/18/2019BriefFiled Proper Person Appellant's Informal Brief. (SC)19-26240
08/02/2019Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/Submitted For Decision. (SC)