Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 78179
Short Caption:DODSON (SAMUEL) VS. WARDENCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):78179-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A767211Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:07/26/2019How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
02/25/2019Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
02/25/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)19-08484
03/11/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Transmission of Record and Regarding Briefing. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. Appellant's Opening Brief and Informal Brief due: 120 days. (SC)19-10710
03/22/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal - Volume 1. (SC)19-12781
07/26/2019Case Status UpdateSubmitted for Decision. (SC)
11/04/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC)19-45174
11/04/2019Case Status UpdateTransferred to Court of Appeals. (SC)
12/20/2019Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB. (SC).
01/14/2020Case Status UpdateTransferred from Court of Appeals. (SC)
01/14/2020RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)20-01712
01/14/2020Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
02/03/2020RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on January 22, 2020. (SC)20-01712