Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 78187
Short Caption:REYNOLDS VS. TUFENKJIANCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A753532Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Briefing in Progress
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:03/08/2019 / Levitt, LansfordSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
02/26/2019Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
02/26/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)19-08717
02/26/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)19-08719
03/06/2019Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Marx Law Firm. Check no. 1005. (SC)
03/07/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC).19-10219
03/08/2019Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lansford W. Levitt. (SC).19-10469
03/20/2019Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC)19-12459
03/21/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. (SC)19-12502
03/21/2019Docketing StatementFiled Amended Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC)19-12588
03/22/2019Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation. (SC).19-12852
03/25/2019Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. Appellants: 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. (SC).19-12989
04/05/2019Transcript RequestFiled Certificate That No Transcript is Requested. (SC)19-14882
04/25/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order to Show Cause. Appellants shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Respondents may file any reply within 14 days from the date that appellants' response is served. Briefing is suspended. (SC).19-18136
05/20/2019MotionFiled Appellants' Response to Order to Show Cause.19-21910
06/11/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Reinstating Briefing. Appellants' Opening Brief and Appendix due: 90 days. (SC).19-25150
07/25/2019MotionFiled Respondents' Motion to Substitute as Real Parties in Interest for this Appeal and Dismiss. (SC)19-31433
08/01/2019MotionFiled Appellant's Response to Motion to Substitute as Real Parties in Interest for This Appeal and Dismiss. (SC)19-32523
08/06/2019MotionFiled Respondents' Reply in Support of Motion to Substitute as Real Parties in Interest for this Appeal and Dismiss. (SC)19-33035
09/09/2019Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: September 23, 2019. (SC)19-37576
09/23/2019BriefFiled Appellants' Opening Brief. (SC)19-39497
09/23/2019AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 1 (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED SEPTEMBER 24, 2019). (SC)
09/23/2019AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume II (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED SEPTEMBER 24, 2019). (SC)
09/23/2019AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume III (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED SEPTEMBER 24, 2019). (SC)
09/23/2019AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume IV (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED SEPTEMBER 24, 2019). (SC)
09/24/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Appendix. Corrected appendix due: 5 days.19-39612
09/30/2019AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol I. (STRICKEN PER ORDER 6/22/20). (SC)
09/30/2019AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol II. (STRICKEN PER ORDER 6/22/20). (SC)
09/30/2019AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol III. (STRICKEN PER ORDER 6/22/20). (SC)
09/30/2019AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol IV. (STRICKEN PER ORDER 6/22/20). (SC)
10/21/2019MotionFiled Respondents' Motion to Stay Briefing, or, in the Alternative, Motion for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief and Appendix. (SC)19-43488
11/01/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order for Supplemental Briefing. The parties shall each have 15 days from the date of this order to file and serve a supplemental brief. Briefing of this appeal is suspended pending further order of this court. fn1 [The motion to stay briefing or for an extension of time to file the answering brief is denied as moot.] (SC).19-44998
11/18/2019BriefFiled Respondents' Supplemental Briefing on Motion to Dismiss. (SC)19-47235
11/18/2019BriefFiled Appellants' Supplemental to Response to Motion to Substitute as Real Parties in Interest for this Appeal and Dismiss. (SC)19-47236
04/09/2020Opinion/Non-DispositionalFiled Non-Dispositional Opinion "Motion granted in part; appeal dismissed in part." We grant respondents' motion to substitute themselves for appellants as to those claims and to voluntarily dismiss this appeal as to those claims. Accordingly, we reinstate briefing solely as to the summary judgment on appellants' claims for fraud and elder exploitation. Respondents shall have 30 days from the date of this opinion to file and serve the answering brief. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). Before Hardesty/Stiglich/Silver. Author: Silver, J. Majority: Silver/Hardesty/Stiglich. 136 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 19. SNP20-JH/LS/AS. (SC).20-13445
05/08/2020MotionFiled Respondent's Motion for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief. (SC).20-17582
05/12/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondents' Answering Brief due: June 10, 2020. (SC).20-18040
05/27/2020MotionFiled Respondents' Motion to Strike Appellants' Appendix and Motion to Stay Briefing. (SC)20-19910
06/03/2020MotionFiled Appellants' Response to Motion to Strike Appellants' Appendix and Motion to Stay Briefing. (SC)20-20934
06/09/2020MotionFiled Respondent's Reply in Support of Motion to Strike Appellants' Appendix and Motion to Stay Briefing. (SC).20-21639
06/10/2020MotionFiled Respondents' Motion for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief and Appendix (Second Request). (SC)20-21836
06/22/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion to Strike and Regarding Motion for Extension of Time. The clerk shall strike the appendix filed on September 30, 2019. Appellants shall have 7 days from the date of this order to file and serve an amended appendix that contains legible page numbers on all pages and an index that fully complies with NRAP 30(c)(2). Respondents shall have 21 days from the date of this order to file and serve the answering brief. (SC)20-23093
06/29/2020AppendixFiled Appellants' Amended Appendix Vol. I. (SC).20-24003
06/29/2020AppendixFiled Appellants' Amended Appendix Vol. II. (SC).20-24004
06/29/2020AppendixFiled Appellants' Amended Appendix Vol. III. (SC).20-24005
06/29/2020AppendixFiled Appellants' Amended Appendix Vol. IV. (SC).20-24006
07/13/2020BriefFiled Respondents' Answering Brief. (SC)20-25757
07/13/2020AppendixFiled Respondents' Appendix - Volume 1. (SC)20-25759