Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 76715-COA
Short Caption:IN RE: APPLICATION OF FINLEYCourt:Court of Appeals
Related Case(s):76715
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A771524Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
02/26/2019Case Status UpdateTransferred from Supreme Court. (COA)
07/25/2019Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Reversal and Remand. "ORDER the judgment of the district court REVERSED AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB.19-31385
08/07/2019MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Reissue Order of Reversal and Remand as a Published Opinion. (COA)19-33303
12/26/2019Opinion/Non-DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Reversed and remanded." Fn1[We originally resolved this appeal in an unpublished order of reversal and remand. Appellant subsequently filed a motion to publish the order as an opinion. We grant the motion and replace our earlier order with this opinion. See NRAP 36(f).] Before Gibbons/Tao/Bulla. Author: Tao, J. Majority: Gibbons/Tao/Bulla. 135 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 63. (COA)19-52111
01/21/2020Case Status UpdateTransferred to Supreme Court. (COA)
01/21/2020Case Status UpdateCase Closed. (COA)