Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 78207
Short Caption:HUNTER (EVERETT) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):71826, 71826-COA, 78207-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR151841Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Transferred to Court of Appeals
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:07/26/2019How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
02/27/2019Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
02/27/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)19-09093
03/11/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Transmission of Record and Regarding Briefing. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. Appellant's Opening Brief or Informal Brief due: 120 days. (SC)19-10602
03/13/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal (VOL 1). (SC)19-11159
03/13/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal (VOL 2). (SC)19-11160
03/13/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal (VOL 3). (SC)19-11161
03/13/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal (VOL 4). (SC)19-11162
03/13/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal (VOL 5). (SC)19-11163
03/13/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal (VOL 6). (SC)19-11164
03/13/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal (VOL 7). (SC)19-11167
03/13/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal (VOL 8). (SC)19-11168
03/15/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal (VOL 9) (SEALED). (SC)
03/15/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Presentence Investigation Report (SEALED). (SC)
07/26/2019Case Status UpdateSubmitted for Decision. (SC)
10/24/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC)19-43962
10/24/2019Case Status UpdateTransferred to Court of Appeals. (SC)