Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 78227
Short Caption:CONNERS (DARRELL) VS. WARDENCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A769844Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Submitted for Decision
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:07/26/2019How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/01/2019Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
03/01/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)19-09389
03/12/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Transmission of Record and Regarding Briefing. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. Appellant's Opening Brief or Informal Brief due: 120 days. (SC)19-10808
03/25/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal - VOL 1. (SC)19-13113
03/29/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal pages 1 to 3 and 15 to 18 (SEALED). (SC)
07/26/2019Case Status UpdateSubmitted for Decision. (SC)