Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 78240
Short Caption:SHARP (MARK) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):72935, 78240-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Humboldt Co. - Sixth Judicial District - CV 20479Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Transferred to Court of Appeals
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:07/16/2019How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/04/2019Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
03/04/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement and Notice of Briefing Schedule mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC)19-09649
03/04/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Transcript Request. (SC)19-09651
03/11/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Copy of District Court Docket Entries. (SC)19-10755
03/11/2019Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 10/03/18. To Court Reporter: Kathy Brumm. (SC)19-10772
03/22/2019Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. (SC)19-12892
04/10/2019Notice/IncomingFiled Substitution of Attorneys (Mark L. Sharp in Pro Per in place of David D. Loreman for Appellant). (SC)19-15753
04/16/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Approving Substitution and Directing Transmission of Record. The clerk shall remove David D. Loreman as counsel of record for appellant, and appellant shall proceed in this appeal in pro se. Appellant's Opening Brief or Informal Brief due: July 2, 2019. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. (SC).19-16652
05/14/2019Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Record on Appeal due: May 30, 2019. (SC).19-20983
05/31/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal - Volumes I, II, III, V, VI, VII and VIII (Via FTP) (SC)19-23729
06/03/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal (PSI) Volume 4. (SEALED). (SC)
06/26/2019Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document - "Judicial Request for Appointment of Counsel." (SC)19-27492
07/03/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Appellant has filed a motion requesting the appointment of appellate counsel. The motion is denied. (SC).19-28553
07/16/2019Case Status UpdateSubmitted for Decision. (SC).
09/19/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC)19-39113
09/19/2019Case Status UpdateTransferred to Court of Appeals. (SC)