Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 78243
Short Caption:LEWIS VS. DIST. CT. (UNITED AUTO. INS. CO.) C/W 78085Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated:78085*, 78243Related Case(s):78085, 79487, 80965
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A549111
Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A772220
Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus
Disqualifications:Case Status:En Banc Reconsider Filed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:01/24/2020How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/05/2019Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $250.00 from Thomas Christensen. (SC)
03/05/2019Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus. (SC)Y19-09742
03/05/2019AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ Volume I. (SC)19-09884
03/05/2019AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ Volume II. (SC)19-09885
03/19/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer. Real parties on behalf of respondents, shall have 28 days from the date of this order to file and serve an answer against issuance of the requested writ. Thereafter, petitioner shall have 14 days from service of the answer to file and serve any reply. fn1[If Cheyenne Nalder will not be filing an answer to this petition, she should inform this court in writing within the time allowed to file an answer.] (SC)19-12124
04/16/2019Petition/WritFiled Real Party in Interest Cheyenne Nalder's Response to Petition for Writ of Mandams. (SC)19-16556
04/16/2019Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance (Daniel F. Polsenberg, Joel D. Henriod and Abraham G. Smith as counsel for Real Party in Interest United Automobile Insurance Company). (SC)19-16742
04/16/2019MotionFiled Real Party in Interest United Automobile Insurance Company's Motion for Extension to File Answer. (SC)19-16743
05/09/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. United Automobile Insurance Company's Answer due: June 17, 2019. Petitioner shall have 14 days from service of UAIC's answer to file and serve any reply. (SC)19-20398
06/17/2019MotionFiled Real Party in Interest United Automobile Insurance Company's Motion for Extension to File Answer. (SC)19-26196
06/25/2019MotionFiled Petitioner's Objection to UAIC's Second Request for Extension to File Answer. (SC)19-27335
07/02/2019MotionFiled Real Party in Interest United Automobile Insurance Company's Reply Brief on Motion for Extension to File Answer. (SC).19-28432
07/03/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Regarding Motion. Real Party in Interest United Automobile Insurance Company's Answer to the Writ Petition due: July 10, 2019. Petitioner shall have 14 days from service of UAIC's answer to file and serve any reply. (SC).19-28543
07/10/2019AppendixFiled Real Party in Interest United Automobile Insurance Company's Appendix Volume 1. (SC)19-29360
07/10/2019AppendixFiled Real Party in Interest United Automobile Insurance Company's Appendix Volume 2. (SC)19-29361
07/10/2019AppendixFiled Real Party in Interest United Automobile Insurance Company's Appendix Volume 3. (SC)19-29362
07/10/2019AppendixFiled Real Party in Interest United Automobile Insurance Company's Appendix Volume 4. (SC)19-29363
07/10/2019AppendixFiled Real Party in Interest United Automobile Insurance Company's Appendix Volume 5. (SC)19-29364
07/10/2019AppendixFiled Real Party in Interest United Automobile Insurance Company's Appendix Volume 6. (SC)19-29365
07/10/2019AppendixFiled Real Party in Interest United Automobile Insurance Company's Appendix Volume 7. (SC)19-29366
07/10/2019AppendixFiled Real Party in Interest United Automobile Insurance Company's Appendix Volume 8. (SC)19-29369
07/10/2019AppendixFiled Real Party in Interest United Automobile Insurance Company's Appendix Volume 9. (SC)19-29371
07/10/2019AppendixFiled Real Party in Interest United Automobile Insurance Company's Appendix Volume 10. (SC)19-29373
07/10/2019AppendixFiled Real Party in Interest United Automobile Insurance Company's Appendix Volume 11. (SC)19-29374
07/10/2019AppendixFiled Real Party in Interest United Automobile Insurance Company's Appendix Volume 12. (SC)19-29375
07/10/2019Petition/WritFiled Real Party in Interest United Automobile Insurance Company's Answer. (SC)19-29400
07/25/2019MotionFiled Stipulation for Extension to File Reply Brief. (SC)19-31529
07/30/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Approving Stipulation. Petitioner's Reply due: August 26, 2019. (SC)19-32120
08/26/2019Petition/WritFiled Petitioner's Reply to Response to Petition for Writ of Mandamus Pursuant to NRS 34.160. (SC)19-35719
01/24/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. Nos. 78085/78243. (SC).20-03512
04/30/2020Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Petitions granted in part and denied in part." Before: Stiglich/Gibbons/Silver. 136 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 24. SNP20-MG/LS/AS Nos. 78085/78243. (SC)20-16341
04/30/2020WritIssued Writ with letter. Original and one copy of writ and copy of opinion mailed to attorney David A. Stephens and Thomas Christensen for service upon Judge David M. Jones and Judge Eric Johnson. Nos. 78243/78085. (SC)20-16478
05/18/2020MotionFiled Petitioner's Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs and for Reconsideration. Nos. 78085/78243. (SC)20-18932
05/19/2020WritFiled Returned Writ. Original Writ returned. Served on Judge David Jones on 5/11/2020. Nos.78085/78243. (SC)20-19106
05/26/2020MotionFiled Real Party in Interest's Opposition to Petitoners' "Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs and for Reconsideration." Nos. 78085/78243. (SC)20-19903
07/01/2020Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). Nos. 78085/78243. (SC).20-24335
07/14/2020Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petitioner Gary Lewis's Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. Nos. 78085/78243. (SC).Y20-25923