Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Combined Case Information: 78260 & 78260-COA
Short Caption:MAKI (CHARLES) VS. WARDENCourt:Supreme Court & Court of Appeals
Related Case(s):30904, 63845, 66144, 67717, 67800, 69049, 78260-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR940345Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Transferred to Court of Appeals
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:07/08/2019How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/06/2019Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
03/06/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)19-10025
03/06/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. (Second NOA) (SC)19-10027
03/18/2019MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Motion to Appoint Counsel. (SC)19-11906
04/23/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Filing of Brief. Order Directing Transmission of Record. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. Within 120 days, appellant may file either (1) a brief that complies with the requirements in NRAP 28(a) and NRAP 32; or (2) the "Informal Brief Form for Pro Se Parties" provided by the supreme court clerk. NRAP 31(a)(1). If no brief is submitted, the appeal may be decided on the record on appeal. (SC).19-17854
04/25/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal (VOL 1). (SC)19-18218
04/25/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal (VOL 2). (SC)19-18219
04/25/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal (VOL 3). (SC)19-18220
04/25/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal (VOL 4). (SC)19-18221
04/25/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal (VOL 5). (SC)19-18222
04/25/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal (VOL 6). (SC)19-18225
04/25/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal (VOL 7). (SC)19-18226
04/25/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal (VOL 8). (SC)19-18228
04/25/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal (VOL 9). (SC)19-18229
04/26/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Presentence Investigation Report (SEALED). (SC).
04/26/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volume 10 (SEALED). (SC).
05/02/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Appellant has filed a motion requesting the appointment of appellate counsel. The motion is denied. (SC)19-19253
05/23/2019BriefFiled Proper Person Appellant's Informal Brief. (SC)19-22516
07/08/2019Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/Submitted For Decision. (SC).
10/16/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC)19-42758
10/16/2019Case Status UpdateTransferred to Court of Appeals. (SC)
10/16/2019Case Status UpdateTransferred from Supreme Court. (COA)
10/18/2019Notice/IncomingFiled Proper Person Appellant's Notice of Change of Address. (COA)19-43263