Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 78264
Short Caption:MULLINS (GRADY) VS. WARDENCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):78264-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Pershing Co. - Eleventh Judicial District - PI 18-1193Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Transferred to Court of Appeals
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:07/05/2019How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/06/2019Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
03/06/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)19-10047
03/11/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Transmission of Record and Regarding Briefing. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. Appellant's Opening Brief or Informal Brief due: 120 days. (SC)19-10667
03/29/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volume 1. (SC)
05/20/2019BriefFiled Proper Person Appellant's Informal Brief. (SC)19-21973
07/05/2019Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/Submitted For Decision. (SC)
09/19/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC)19-39101
09/19/2019Case Status UpdateTransferred to Court of Appeals