Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 78283
Short Caption:HARTNELL-LENZEN (SHANDA) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):71999
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C319006Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Briefing Completed/Submitted For Decision
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:06/04/2019How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/11/2019Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
03/11/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)19-10682
03/20/2019Order/IncomingFiled District court order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on March 13, 2019. Order Denying Defendant's Pro Per Motion to Amend Judgment of Conviction to Include Jail Time Credits. (SC)19-12232
03/20/2019Letter/IncomingFiled Proper Person Letter in Regards to Case. (SC).19-12475
03/26/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Filing of Brief. Order Directing Transmission of Record. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. Within 120 days, appellant may file either (1) a brief that complies with the requirements in NRAP 28(a) and NRAP 32; or (2) the "Informal Brief Form for Pro Se Parties" provided by the supreme court clerk. NRAP 31(a)(1). If no brief is submitted, the appeal may be decided on the record on appeal. (SC).19-13251
04/09/2019Letter/IncomingFiled Proper Person Appellant's Letter Regarding Case. (SC)Y19-15470
04/15/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal - VOL 1. (SC).19-16358
04/16/2019BriefFiled Proper Person Appellant's Informal Brief. (SC).19-16572
04/18/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal pages 106-112 (SEALED). (SC).
04/24/2019Letter/IncomingFiled Proper Person Letter Regarding Case. (SC)Y19-17882
06/04/2019Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/Submitted For Decision. (SC).
06/13/2019Letter/IncomingFiled Proper Person Appellant's Letter Regarding Case. (SC)Y19-25691
07/03/2019Notice/IncomingFiled Proper Person Appellant's Notice of Change of Address. (SC)19-28501