Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 78298
Short Caption:GILL (KEVIN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):46957, 47480, 64325
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR041265Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Briefing Completed/Submitted For Decision
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:07/15/2019How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/12/2019Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
03/12/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)19-10987
03/26/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Transmission of Record and Regarding Briefing. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. Appellant's Opening Brief or Informal Brief due: 120 days. (SC)19-13275
03/29/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal (VOL 1). (SC)19-13916
03/29/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal (VOL 2). (SC)19-13918
03/29/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal (VOL 3). (SC)19-13919
03/29/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal (VOL 4). (SC)19-13920
03/29/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal (VOL 5). (SC)19-13922
03/29/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal (VOL 6). (SC)19-13923
03/29/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal (VOL 7). (SC)19-13924
04/01/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal - Volume 8 - SEALED. (SC)
04/01/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Documents. SEALED PSI Report. (SC)
04/15/2019Notice/IncomingFiled Proper Person Appellant's Notice of Change of Address.19-16459
05/29/2019BriefFiled Proper Person Appellant's Informal Brief with Attachments. (DETACHED ATTACHMENTS AND RETURNED UNFILED PER ORDER FILED 6/12/19). (SC)19-23239
06/12/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant has filed an informal brief with attachments. The clerk of this court shall detach the attachments from the brief, and return them, unfiled. Respondent need not file a response to the brief unless ordered to do so by this court. (SC)19-25407
07/15/2019Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/Submitted For Decision. No answering brief filed. (SC)