Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 78301
Short Caption:CHUR VS. DIST. CT. (STATE, COMM'R OF INS.)Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A711535Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:10/21/2019How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/13/2019Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $250.00 from J. Stephen Peek. (SC)
03/13/2019Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus. (SC)19-11056
03/13/2019AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 1. (SC)19-11151
03/13/2019AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 2. (SC)19-11152
03/13/2019AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 3. (SC)19-11153
03/13/2019AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 4. (SC)19-11154
03/13/2019AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 5. (SC)19-11155
03/13/2019AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 6. (SC)19-11156
05/15/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer. Real Party in Interest Commissioner of Insurance for the State of Nevada's Answer to the Petition for Writ due: 28 days. Petitioners shall have 14 days from service of the answer to file and serve any reply. fn1 [Although listed as real parties in interest, it does not appear that Uni-Ter Underwriting Management Corp., Unit-Ter Claims Service Corp., or U.S. Re Corporation have an interest in the resolution of this writ petition. If any of those entities believe they do have an interest in the resolution of this writ petition, those entities shall notify the clerk of this court within 5 days of the entry of this order. If any of those entities fail to notify the clerk within 5 days, the clerk shall remove that entity from the caption of this case.] (SC).19-21298
06/12/2019Petition/WritFiled Answer to Petition for Writ. (SC)19-25528
06/12/2019AppendixFiled Appendix to Real Party in Interest's Answering Brief Volume 1. (SC)19-25530
06/17/2019Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Petitioner's Reply in Support of Writ Petition due: July 10, 2019. (SC)19-26120
07/10/2019Petition/WritFiled Petitioner's Reply in Support of Petition for Writ of Mandamus. (SC)19-29311
10/21/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. (SC)19-43443
02/06/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Firm Affiliation (Brenoch R. Wirthlin is no longer affiliated with the law firm of Fennemore Craig P.C. Mr. Wirthlin is now affiliated with the law firm of Kolesar & Leatham).20-05208
02/07/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Amended Notice of Change of Firm Affiliation (Brenoch R. Wirthlin counsel for Respondent Teacher's Health Trust is no longer affiliated with the law firm of Fennemore Craig, P.C. Mr. Wirthlin is now affiliated with the law firm of Kolesar & Leatham.) (SC)20-05397
02/12/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Amended Notice of Change of Firm Affiliation (Brenoch R. Wirthlin, counsel for Real Party in Interest Commissioner of Insurance for the State of Nevada as Receiver of Lewis and Clark Ltd. Risk Retention Group, Inc. in the above matter, is no longer affiliated with the law firm of Fennemore Craig. P.C.; Mr. Wirthlin is now affiliated with the law firm of Kolesar & Leatham). (SC)20-05835
02/27/2020Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Petition granted." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Hardesty, J. Majority: Hardesty/Pickering/Gibbons/Parraguirre/Stiglich/Cadish/Silver. 136 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 7. EN BANC (SC)20-07840
02/27/2020WritIssued Writ with letter. Original and one copy of writ and copy of opinion mailed to Attorney J. Stephen Peek for service upon Judge Nancy L. Allf. (SC)20-07906
02/28/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Address/Change of Law Firm (Brenoch R. Wirthlin is now with Hutchison & Steffen, PLLC). (SC)20-08182
03/02/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Real Party in Interest Commissioner of Insurance for The State of Nevada's Petition for Rehearing due: March 30, 2020. (SC).20-08317
03/03/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Certificate of Service (Writ of Mandamus and Opinion of the Court). (SC)20-08537
03/10/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Substitution of Counsel (Brenoch R. Wirthlin of the law firm of Hutchison & Steffen in place and stead of the law office of Fennemore Craig, P.C.). (SC)20-09487
03/18/2020MotionFiled Real Party in Interest Commissioner of Insurance for the State of Nevada as Receiver of Lewis and Clark LTC Risk Retention Group, Inc.'s Emergency Motion Under NRAP 27(e) to File Petition for Rehearing (Second Request). (SC)20-10567
03/26/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Real Party in Interest's Petition for Rehearing due: April 29, 2020. (SC).20-11657
04/29/2020Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Real Party in Interest's Petition for Rehearing. (SC)20-16328
04/29/2020Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $150.00 from Brenoch R. Wirthlin. (SC)
05/22/2020Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). (SC).20-19537
06/16/2020RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu/Rehearing. (SC)20-22374
06/16/2020Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)