Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 78319
Short Caption:RAND PROPS., LLC VS. FILIPPINICourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):63247, 63835, 66933
Lower Court Case(s):Lander Co. - Eleventh Judicial District - CV0010122Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:Exempt
Oral Argument:09/08/2020 at 11:00 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:09/08/2020How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/14/2019Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. Filing fee will be forwarded by the District Court. (SC)
03/14/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC)19-11374
03/14/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. (SC)19-11378
03/18/2019Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Eleventh Judicial District Court. Check no. 1016. (SC)
03/19/2019Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Exemption from Settlement Program. It has been determined that this appeal will not be assigned to the settlement program. Appellant: 14 days transcript request form; 120 days opening brief. (SC).19-12079
04/01/2019Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 07/19/17. To Court Reporter: Zoie Williams. (SC)19-14139
04/03/2019Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC)19-14601
07/16/2019Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: July 31, 2019. (SC)19-30024
07/31/2019BriefFiled Appellant Rand Properties, LLC's Opening Brief (REJECTED PER PHONE CALL WITH ATTORNEY - JULY 31, 2019). (SC)
07/31/2019BriefFiled Appellant Rand Properties, LLC's Opening Brief. (SC)19-32256
07/31/2019AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix - Volume 1. (SC)19-32258
07/31/2019AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix - Volume 2. (SC)19-32208
07/31/2019AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix - Volume 3. (SC)19-32213
07/31/2019AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix - Volume 4. (SC)19-32214
07/31/2019AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix - Volume 5. (SC)19-32211
07/31/2019AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix - Volume 6. (SC)19-32215
07/31/2019AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix - Volume 7. (SC)19-32217
07/31/2019AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix - Volume 8. (SC)19-32220
07/31/2019AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix - Volume 9. (SC)19-32225
07/31/2019AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix - Volume 10. (SC)19-32227
07/31/2019AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix - Volume 11. (SC)19-32228
07/31/2019AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix - Volume 12. (SC)19-32229
08/09/2019Notice/IncomingFiled Respondent Filippini's Nev. R. App. P.26.1 Disclosure Statement. (SC)19-33631
08/09/2019MotionFiled Respondent Filippini's Motion for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief. (SC)19-33634
08/09/2019Notice/IncomingFiled Affidavit of Therese A. Ure in Support of Respondent Filippini's Motion for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief. (SC)19-33637
08/16/2019MotionFiled Appellant's Opposition to Filippini's [SIC] Motion for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief. (SC)19-34467
08/20/2019MotionFiled Respondent Filippini's Reply to Opposition to Motion for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief. (SC)19-34930
08/20/2019Notice/IncomingFiled Affidavit of Lisa Mae Gage in Support of Respondent Filippini's Reply to Motion for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief. (SC)19-34931
08/29/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondents Daniel and Eddyann Fillipini's Answering Brief due: October 30, 2019. (SC).19-36176
08/30/2019BriefFiled Respondent Julian Tomera Ranches, Inc., Battle Mountain Division's Answering Brief. (SC).19-36575
08/30/2019AppendixFiled Julian Tomera Ranches, Inc., Battle Mountain Division's Appendix - Volume I. (SC).19-36576
08/30/2019AppendixFiled Julian Tomera Ranches, Inc., Battle Mountain Division's Appendix - Volume II. (SC).19-36578
08/30/2019AppendixFiled Julian Tomera Ranches, Inc., Battle Mountain Division's Appendix - Volume III. (SC).19-36580
10/30/2019BriefFiled Respondent Filippini's Answering Brief. (SC)19-44683
10/30/2019AppendixFiled Respondent Filippini's Appendix Volume 1. (SC)19-44684
10/30/2019AppendixFiled Respondent Filippini's Appendix Volume 2. (SC)19-44685
10/30/2019AppendixFiled Respondent Filippini's Appendix Volume 3. (SC)19-44688
10/30/2019AppendixFiled Respondent Filippini's Appendix Volume 4. (SC)19-44691
10/30/2019AppendixFiled Respondent Filippini's Appendix Volume 5. (SC)19-44692
10/30/2019AppendixFiled Respondent Filippini's Appendix Volume 6. (SC)19-44695
10/30/2019AppendixFiled Respondent Filippini's Appendix Volume 7. (SC)19-44698
10/30/2019AppendixFiled Respondent Filippini's Appendix Volume 8. (SC)19-44699
10/30/2019AppendixFiled Respondent Filippini's Appendix Volume 9. (SC)19-44705
10/30/2019AppendixFiled Respondent Filippini's Appendix Volume 10. (SC)19-44706
10/30/2019AppendixFiled Respondent Filippini's Appendix Volume 11. (SC)19-44707
11/26/2019Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's Reply Brief due: December 16, 2019. (SC).19-48253
12/16/2019BriefFiled Appellant Rand Properties, LLC's Reply Brief. (SC)19-50858
12/16/2019AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix - Volume XIII. (SC)19-50859
12/16/2019AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix - Volume XIV. (SC)19-50861
12/16/2019Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
02/20/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Respondents' Notice of Unavailable Dates for Oral Argument During Certain Period of Time. (SC)20-07015
07/30/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Scheduling Oral Argument. This appeal is scheduled for oral argument on September 8, 2020, at 11:00 a.m. The argument will be videoconferenced. The court will use the BlueJeans videoconferencing system, which requires laptop/desktop/videoconferencing computer internet access and audio and video (web camera) capability. In case technical difficulties develop at any time, the court will conduct the oral argument by teleconference, which will require counsel to have immediate access to a landline phone connection. Within 14 days of the date of this order, the parties shall submit to the Clerk of the Court a notice identifying the attorney(s) who will argue the case and the phone number and email address of that attorney(s). The notice may be emailed to the court at nvscclerk@nvcourts.nv.gov. The attorneys will be required to schedule a session with the Clerk of the Court to test the capabilities of the connection and video equipment approximately one week prior to argument. (SC)20-27796
08/11/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Notice Identifying Attorney for Oral Argument. Counsel who will argue the case for Appellant Rand Properties, LLC, is Karl Y. Olse. Also in attendance for Rand Properties, LLC, but not arguing the case, will be counsel John E. Marvel. (SC)20-29501
08/12/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Notice Identifying Attorney for Oral Argument (Laura A. Schroeder will argue the case for Respondent Daniel and Eddyann Filippini. Also in attendance but not arguing the case, will be counsel Therese A. Ure). (SC)20-29762
08/13/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Notice Identifying Attorney for Oral Argument (Travis W. Gerber will argue the case for Respondents Julian Tomera Ranches, Inc., and Battle Mountain Division. Also in attendance but not arguing the case, will be counsel Zachary A. Gerber). (SC)20-29930
08/25/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (SC)20-31280
09/08/2020Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court. 78319. (SC)
04/09/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Affirming in Part and Reversing in Part. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED IN PART and REVERSED IN PART." Pickering, J., with whom Cadish, J., and Silver, J., agree, concurring in part and dissenting in part. EN BANC (SC)21-10287
04/27/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant's Petition for Rehearing. (SC)21-12103
04/27/2021Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $150.00 from Karl Y. Olsen. (SC)
05/10/2021Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). (SC)21-13255
06/04/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-15981
06/04/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
06/18/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 9, 2021. (SC)21-15981