Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 78333
Short Caption:TOLL VS. DIST. CT. (GILMAN)Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Storey Co. - First Judicial District - 18TRT00001Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus/Prohibition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:09/05/2019 at 10:30 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:09/05/2019How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/18/2019Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Petition. (SC)
03/18/2019Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. (SC)19-11788
03/18/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)19-11790
03/18/2019Notice/IncomingFiled Petitioner's Notice of Filing of Extraordinary Writ. (SC)19-11797
03/18/2019AppendixFiled Petitioners Master Appendix. (SC)19-11801
03/18/2019AppendixFiled Petitioners Alphabetical Appendix. (SC)19-11825
03/18/2019AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 1. (SC)19-11802
03/18/2019AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 2. (SC)19-11803
03/18/2019AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 3. (SC)19-11804
03/18/2019AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 4. (SC)19-11805
03/18/2019AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 5. (SC)19-11806
03/18/2019AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 6. (SC)19-11809
03/18/2019AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 7. (SC)19-11810
03/18/2019AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 8. (SC)19-11812
03/18/2019AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 9. (SC)19-11813
03/18/2019AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 10. (SC)19-11816
03/18/2019AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 11. (SC)19-11817
03/18/2019AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 12. (SC)19-11818
03/18/2019Filing FeeE-Payment $250.00 from Luke A. Busby
03/25/2019MotionFiled Proposed Amici The Nevada Press Association, The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press, The News Media Alliance, the Online Press Association, the Media Institute, the Society of Professional Journalists and Reporters Without Borders' Motion to File Amici Curiae Brief/Request for Invitation to Participate in Support of Petitioner. (SC)19-13187
03/25/2019BriefFiled [PROPOSED] Brief of Amici Curiae The Nevada Press Association, the Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press, the News Media Alliance, the Online New Association, the Media Institute, the Society of Professional Journalists, and Reporters Without Borders. (SC)19-13190
03/28/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order. A motion seeking permission to file an amicus brief was filed on March 25, 2019. We grant the motion. The proposed brief was filed March 25, 2019. Real Party in Interest's Answer to the Petition for Writ due: 21 days. Petitioner shall have 14 days from service of the answer to file and serve any reply. (SC).19-13745
04/02/2019Notice/IncomingFiled Petitioner's Notice of Entry of Order in District Court Granting Stay of Discovery. (SC)19-14357
04/11/2019Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Real Party in Interest's Answer to Petition for Writ due: May 2, 2019. (SC)19-16004
05/02/2019MotionFiled Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Answer. (SC)19-19261
05/06/2019Petition/WritFiled Respondents/Real Parties in Interest's Answering Brief. (SC)19-19876
05/07/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Approving Stipulation. Petitioner shall have 14 days from the date of this order to file and serve any reply. (SC)19-20068
05/10/2019Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Petitioner's Reply in Support of the Petition for Writ due: June 4, 2019. (SC).19-20584
05/10/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Modification of Caption. Parties are advised to notify this office in writing within 10 days if the caption as modified does not accurately reflect the status of the parties. (SC)19-20617
05/16/2019Letter/IncomingFiled Letter from First Judicial District Court - Carson City - Re: Modification of Caption. (SC)19-21644
06/02/2019Petition/WritFiled Petitioner's Reply to Real Party in Interest's Answering Brief to Petition for Writ of Prohibition or Mandamus. (SC)19-23853
08/05/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for Thursday, September 5, 2019, at 10:30 a.m. in Carson City. Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. (SC)19-32901
08/21/2019Notice/OutgoingOral Argument Reminder Notice19-35015
09/05/2019Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court. (SC)
12/05/2019Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Petition granted in part and denied in part." Given that the district court erred by holding that a blog could not be considered a newspaper on the grounds it exists in digital form, we grant this petition in part and instruct the district court to conduct further proceedings to determine whether Toll's blog qualifies for protection under the news shield statute. Furthermore, because the district court did not arbitrarily or capriciously exercise its discretion in ordering discovery in accordance with NRS 41.660(4), we deny that portion of the writ. We direct the clerk of this court to issue a writ of prohibition instructing the district court to vacate its order granting Gilman's motion to compel and to reconsider the motion in light of this opinion. Before the Court En Banc. Author: Gibbons, C.J., Majority: Gibbons, Pickering, Hardesty, Parraguirre, Stiglich, Cadish, Silver, JJ. 135 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 58. (SC)19-49275
12/05/2019WritIssued Writ with letter. Original and one copy of writ and copy of opinion mailed to attorney Luke Busby for service upon Judge James E. Wilson. (SC)19-49298
12/12/2019WritFiled Returned Writ. Original Writ returned. Served on Judge James E. Wilson on December 12, 2019. (SC)19-50506
12/12/2019Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Service of Writ of Prohibition. (SC)19-50532
12/30/2019RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. (SC)19-52332