Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Combined Case Information: 78339
Short Caption:JORDAN (STEPHON) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):76910
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A781150, C309412Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:08/23/2019How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/18/2019Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
03/18/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)19-11876
03/26/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Transmission of Record and Regarding Briefing. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. Appellant's Opening Brief or Informal Brief due: 120 days. (SC)19-13272
04/09/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal - VOL 1. (A-18-781150-W) (SC)19-15374
04/09/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal, (C309412), Volumes 1-6 (Via FTP). (SC)19-15393
04/16/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal pages 1100-1110 (SEALED). (SC).
07/10/2019BriefFiled Proper Person Appellant's Informal Brief. (SC)19-29296
08/23/2019Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/Submitted For Decision. (SC)
03/18/2020Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Silver, J., dissenting. KP/MG/AS. (SC).20-10646