Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 78345
Short Caption:HERRERA (LUIS) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A779913Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Submitted for Decision
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:08/23/2019How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/19/2019Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
03/19/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)19-12058
03/22/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. (Second NOA) (SC)19-12896
03/26/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order to Enter Written Judgment or Order. District Court Order due: 60 days. (SC).19-13232
04/02/2019Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance for Respondents (Senior Deputy Attorney General Allison Herr as counsel for Respondents). (SC)19-14437
04/05/2019Order/IncomingFiled District court order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on April 4, 2019. Decision and Order. (SC)19-14980
04/10/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Transmission of Record and Regarding Briefing. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. Appellant's Opening Brief or Informal Brief due: 120 days. (SC)19-15529
05/06/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal - VOL 1. (SC)19-19676
05/09/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal pages 1 to 5 and 17 to 20 (SEALED). (SC)
08/23/2019Case Status UpdateSubmitted for Decision. (SC)