Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 78346
Short Caption:GOODING (CHRISTOPHER) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):78346-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A784790Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Transferred to Court of Appeals
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:06/19/2019How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/19/2019Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
03/19/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)19-12060
03/26/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order to Enter Written Judgment or Order. District Court Order due: 60 days. (SC).19-13230
04/05/2019Order/IncomingFiled District court order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on April 5, 2019. Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law, and Order. (SC)19-14989
04/10/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Transmission of Record and Regarding Briefing. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. Appellant's Opening Brief or Informal Brief due: 120 days. (SC)19-15530
04/17/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal - VOL 1. (SC)19-16950
04/17/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal (Related Case - C329421) - VOL 1. (SC)19-16952
04/22/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Pages 13-37, 50-76 (SEALED). (SC)
04/22/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Pages 21-24, 26-27 (SEALED). (SC)
04/22/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal (PSI) Pages 88-99 (SEALED). (SC)
05/06/2019BriefFiled Proper Person Appellant's Informal Brief. (SC)19-19833
06/19/2019Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/Submitted For Decision. (SC)
09/30/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC)19-40636
09/30/2019Case Status UpdateTransferred to Court of Appeals. (SC)