Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 78362
Short Caption:HUNTER (EVERETT) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Carson City - First Judicial District - 19EW000071BClassification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Submitted for Decision
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:08/14/2019How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/20/2019Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
03/20/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)19-12293
03/29/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Copy of District Court Docket Entries. (SC)19-13969
04/02/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Transmission of Record and Regarding Briefing. Record on Appeal due: 30 days; Appellant's Opening Brief or Informal Brief due: 120 days. (SC)19-14427
04/05/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Copy of District Court Docket Entries. (SC)19-15003
04/19/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volume 1. (SC)
08/14/2019Case Status UpdateSubmitted for Decision. (SC)