Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 78440
Short Caption:NOGUERA (CARLOS) VS. WARDENCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Pershing Co. - Eleventh Judicial District - PI 18-1243Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Briefing Completed/Submitted For Decision
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:07/15/2019How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/28/2019Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
03/28/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)19-13738
04/17/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Filing of Brief. Order Directing Transmission of Record. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. Within 120 days, appellant may file either (1) a brief that complies with the requirements in NRAP 28(a) and NRAP 32; or (2) the "Informal Brief Form for Pro Se Parties" provided by the supreme court clerk. NRAP 31(a)(1). If no brief is submitted, the appeal may be decided on the record on appeal. (SC).19-16770
05/16/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volume 1. (SC)
05/29/2019BriefFiled Proper Person Appellant's Informal Brief. (SC)19-23241
05/29/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Service. Due date: 5 days.19-23243
06/26/2019Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Attorney (Geordan Goebel replaces Amanda C. Sage for Respondent). (SC)19-27521
06/27/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Regarding Proof of Service. On May 29, 2019, appellant filed an informal brief. The brief was not accompanied by a certificate of service. Appellant shall have 7 days from the date of this order to provide this court with the required proof of service. Respondent need not file a response to the brief unless ordered to do so by this court. (SC)19-27790
07/10/2019Notice/IncomingFiled Proper Person Response to Order Regarding Proof of Service. (SC)19-29320
07/15/2019Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/Submitted For Decision. (SC).