Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 78482
Short Caption:GREENE (DELBERT) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):77117, 77386, 77386-COA, 78014, 78454, 78454-COA, 81169, 81169-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C328203Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/04/2019Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
04/04/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)19-14676
04/10/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant filed a pro se notice of appeal on March 28, 2019, after the verdict was announced in his criminal trial. Appellant has not yet been sentenced. Although the district court currently retains jurisdiction, upon the entry of the judgment of conviction, appellate jurisdiction will be vested in this court. Upon entry of the judgment of conviction, the clerk of the district court shall immediately transmit a certified copy of the judgment to the clerk of this court. (SC).19-15532
06/28/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Entry and Transmission of Written Order. District Court Order due: 30 days. (SC)19-27867
08/14/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order to Enter Written Judgment or Order. District Court Order due: 30 days. (SC).19-34075
08/27/2019Notice/IncomingFiled Proper Person Appellant's Sworn Affidavit of Delbert Marshall Greene Exercising Under the First & Fourteenth Amend.19-35843
08/27/2019MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Motion to Appoint Appellant Counsel. (SC)19-35844
09/06/2019Order/IncomingFiled District Court's Response to Supreme Court Orders. Sentencing for the above referenced defendant has been continued to September 26, 2019. As soon as the defendant is sentenced and a Judgment of Conviction is filed we will transmit a certified copy of the judgment. (SC)19-37388
10/04/2019Order/IncomingFiled District court order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on October 3, 2019. Judgment of Conviction (Jury Trial). (SC)19-41182
10/08/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order of Limited Remand for Designation of Counsel. District Court's Order Appointing Counsel due: 35 days. fn1 [Given this order, appellant's pro se motion for appointment of counsel is denied as moot.] (SC) (VACATED ORDER PER 11/01/19 ORDER).19-41554
10/22/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day (2nd NOA). (SC).19-43654
11/01/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Vacating Order and Setting Briefing Schedule. On October 8, 2019, this court entered an order of limited remand for the appointment of appellate counsel for appellant. On October 22, 2019, a notice of appeal from attorney Adam L. Gill was filed in this court. This court elects to treat counsel's filing of the notice of appeal as a notice of appearance as counsel for appellant. See NRAP 46(a)(2). Accordingly, this court vacates the order entered on October 8, 2019, and sets the briefing schedule as follows. Appellant's Docketing Statement due: 21 days; Opening Brief and Appendix due: 120 days. (SC).19-44931
11/06/2019Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order Appointing Counsel. Filed certified copy of order filed in district court on 11/05/19 appointing Adam Gill as counsel for appellant. (SC).19-45698
11/21/2019Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. (SC)19-47766
11/26/2019TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter Kimberly Farkas stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Date of Transcripts: 03/04/19, 03/05/19, 03/06/19, 03/07/19, 03/08/19, 03/12/19 (2). (SC)19-48250
02/20/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion For Extension To File Appeal (Opening Brief and Appendix).20-06979
02/27/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until April 28, 2020, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. (SC)20-07880
04/20/2020Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Emergency Notice of Amicus Concerning Prior "Appellant's Motion to be Immediately Heard for Conflict as to New Appointed Appellant Counsel of Record" that was Never Heard but Removed from Courts Calendar (SC).20-14871
04/21/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion For Extension To File Opening Brief. (SC)20-15072
04/21/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service (Appellant's Motion For Extension To File Opening Brief). Due date: 10 days. (SC)20-15084
04/21/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant's Proof of Service (Appellant's Motion For Extension To File Opening Brief). (SC)20-15124
04/23/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Appellant has filed a motion asking for the appointment of new appellate counsel. The motion is denied. (SC)20-15422
04/30/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: June 29, 2020. (SC).20-16352
05/05/2020MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Motion to Dismiss Appellant Court Appointed Counsel Adam L. Gill for Conflict. (SC) (DOCKETED AS A NEW CASE - DOCKET NO. 81169 PER 05/12/20 ORDER).20-16985
05/12/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On May 5, 2020, appellant filed a "Petition for Writ of Mandamus." The clerk of this court shall docket the pro se document as a new proceeding. The clerk shall detach, and file separately under the new proceeding, the "Motion to Waive Filing Fees for Petition for Writ of Mandamus" attached to the petition. fn1 [As this is a criminal proceeding and fees are waived, the motion is denied as moot.] (SC).20-18036
06/24/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion For Extension To File Opening Brief and Appendix. (SC)20-23435
07/06/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until July 29, 2020, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. (SC)20-24772
07/28/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion For Extension To File Opening Brief and Appendix. (SC)20-27399
07/31/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Appellant shall have 21 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. (SC)20-28057
08/20/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)20-30790
08/20/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume I. (SC)20-30793
08/20/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume II. (SC)20-30796
08/20/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume III. (SC)20-30798
08/20/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume IV. (SC)20-30800
08/20/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume V. (SC)20-30801
08/20/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume VI. (SC)20-30802
08/20/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume VII. (SC)20-30803
09/21/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondent's answering brief due: October 5, 2020. (SC)20-34559
09/30/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Respondent's Notice of Appearance for Karen Mishler (SC)20-35846
09/30/2020BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief (SC)20-35847
09/30/2020MotionFiled Respondent's Motion to Transmit Exhibits (SC)20-35849
10/08/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Transmission of Exhibit. District Court Exhibit 149 due: 14 days. (SC)20-37021
11/17/2020Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. No reply brief filed. (SC)
05/14/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." SNP21 - RP/LS/AS (SC)21-13952
06/08/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-16301
06/08/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
06/18/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on June 9, 2021. (SC)21-16301