Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 78490
Short Caption:DAVIS (DEWEY) VS. WARDENCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):78490-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A771250Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:09/09/2019How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/05/2019Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
04/05/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)19-14808
04/05/2019Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance of Counsel (Allison Herr for Respondent). (SC)19-14955
04/26/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Filing of Brief. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. Appellant's Opening Brief or Informal Brief due: 120 days. (SC)19-18349
05/03/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal - VOL 1. (SC)19-19492
05/08/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Pages 13-18 (SEALED). (SC)
09/09/2019Case Status UpdateSubmitted for Decision. (SC).
01/06/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC).20-00535
01/06/2020Case Status UpdateTransferred to Court of Appeals. (SC).
01/30/2020Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB (SC)
02/24/2020Case Status UpdateTransferred from Court of Appeals. (SC)
02/24/2020RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)20-07265
02/24/2020Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
03/09/2020RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on February 28, 2020. (SC)20-07265