Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 78493
Short Caption:GALINDO-CLOUD (DAVID) VS. WARDENCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):67152, 67152-COA, 73727, 73727-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR110770Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Submitted for Decision
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:08/23/2019How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/05/2019Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
04/05/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)19-14846
04/09/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled SEALED - District Court Minutes. (SC)
04/10/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Transmission of Record and Regarding Briefing. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. Appellant's Opening Brief or Informal Brief due: 120 days. (SC)19-15527
04/15/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal (VOL 1). (SC)19-16285
04/15/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal (VOL 2). (SC)19-16286
04/15/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal (VOL 3). (SC)19-16287
04/15/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal (VOL 4). (SC)19-16288
04/16/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal (VOL 5) (SEALED). (SC)
04/16/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Presentence Investigation Report (SEALED). (SC)
08/23/2019Case Status UpdateSubmitted for Decision. (SC)