Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 78538
Short Caption:SATICOY BAY, LLC SER. 350 DURANGO 104 VS. WELLS FARGO HOME MORTG.Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):68435, 68630
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A688410Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Screening Completed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:Exempt
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/10/2019Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
04/10/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)19-15645
04/10/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)19-15647
04/16/2019Filing FeeE-Payment $250.00 from Michael F. Bohn
04/16/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC).19-16584
04/17/2019Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Exemption from Settlement Program. It has been determined that this appeal will not be assigned to the settlement program. Appellant: 14 days transcript request form; 120 days opening brief. (SC).19-16796
05/01/2019Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 01/29/19. To Court Reporter: Judy Chappell. (SC)19-19088
05/07/2019Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC)19-20011
05/09/2019TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Judy Chappell stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 01/29/19. (SC)19-20297
05/15/2019Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance of Counsel (Andrew M. Jacobs and Kelly H. Dove for Respondent). (SC)19-21513
08/15/2019BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC).19-34375
08/15/2019AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 1. (SC).19-34378
08/15/2019AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 2. (SC).19-34379
08/15/2019AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 3. (SC).19-34381
08/15/2019AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 4. (SC).19-34382
09/04/2019Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondent's Answering Brief due: September 30, 2019. (SC).19-36909
09/30/2019BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)19-40663
10/07/2019BriefFiled Brief of Amicus Curiae Federal Housing Finance Agency in Support of Respondent and Affirmance of the District Court's Judgment. (SC)19-41415
10/30/2019BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)19-44631
10/30/2019Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
08/06/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Respondent's Notice of Supplemental Authorities. (SC)20-29060
10/05/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Address. (SC)20-36538