Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 78540
Short Caption:GARNER, III (CHARLES) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):56294, 65924
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C246380Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Briefing Completed/Submitted For Decision
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:07/31/2019How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/10/2019Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. (SC).
04/10/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC).19-15667
04/10/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. (2nd NOA). (SC)19-15668
05/03/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. (Third NOA)19-19589
05/09/2019BriefFiled Proper Person Appellant's Informal Brief. (SC)19-20318
05/14/2019MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Motion to Consolidate N.C.A Filed. (SC).19-21214
05/15/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Transmission of Record and Regarding Briefing. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. Appellant has filed an informal brief. Respondents need not file a response to the brief unless ordered to do so by this court. fn1 [This court takes no action on the motion to consolidate filed on May 14, 2019. All three notice of appeal filed by appellant have been docked under the same docket number, 78540.] (SC).19-21467
05/23/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal - VOL 1. (SC)19-22509
05/23/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal - VOL 2. (SC)19-22511
05/23/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal - VOL 3. (SC)19-22514
05/23/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal - VOL 4. (SC)19-22518
05/28/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal pages 166-171 and 838-842 (SEALED). (SC).
05/28/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal pages 330-337 (SEALED). (SC).
05/28/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal pages 322-329 (SEALED).
07/18/2019Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document "Notice of Bias Prejudice By a J.D.C. Judge." (SC).Y19-30471
07/31/2019Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/Submitted For Decision. (SC).
08/19/2019Notice/IncomingFiled Proper Person Appellant's Notice - "Notice of Judicial Bias by a JDC Judge". (SC)Y19-34665