Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 76173-COA
Short Caption:ROGERS VS. ROGERS (CHILD CUSTODY) C/W 76758Court:Court of Appeals
Consolidated:76173-COA*, 76758-COARelated Case(s):75729, 75729-COA, 76173, 76758, 76758-COA, 77696, 77696-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D555550Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:01/27/2020 at 3:30 PMOral Argument Location:Las Vegas Courtroom
Submission Date:01/27/2020How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/11/2019Case Status UpdateTransferred from Supreme Court. Nos. 76173/76758 (COA)
12/11/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on January 27, 2020 at 3:30 p.m. in Las Vegas. 76173/76758. (COA)19-50158
01/13/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice: Oral argument for this case has been scheduled for January 27, 2020 at 3:30 pm for 30 minutes at the Las Vegas Courtroom. (mh)20-01529
01/22/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Substitution of Attorney for Appellant (Emily McFarling in place of Patricia Marr as counsel for Appellant). Nos. 76173/76758. (COA)20-03017
01/27/2020Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Nos. 76173/76758. (COA).
03/26/2020Order/DispositionalFiled Order Affirming in Part, Reversing in Part and Remanding. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED IN PART AND REVERSED IN PART AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB. Nos. 76173/76758.20-11708
04/20/2020Case Status UpdateTransferred to Supreme Court. (COA)
04/20/2020Case Status UpdateCase Closed. (COA)