Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 78584
Short Caption:HENDRIX (MITZI) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):78526
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A776354Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Briefing Completed/Submitted For Decision
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:08/06/2019How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/17/2019Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
04/17/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)19-16846
04/26/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Filing of Brief. Order Directing Transmission of Record. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. Within 120 days, appellant may file either (1) a brief that complies with the requirements in NRAP 28(a) and NRAP 32; or (2) the "Informal Brief Form for Pro Se Parties" provided by the supreme court clerk. NRAP 31(a)(1). If no brief is submitted, the appeal may be decided on the record on appeal. (SC).19-18404
05/03/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal - VOL 1. (SC)19-19495
05/03/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal (Related Case A776358) - VOL 1. (SC)19-19497
05/08/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Pages 16-21 (SEALED). (SC)
06/20/2019BriefFiled Proper Person Appellant's Informal Brief. (SC)19-26686
08/06/2019Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/Submitted For Decision. (SC)