Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 78597
Short Caption:WASHINGTON (MATTHEW) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):65998, 75777, 75777-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C294695Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/18/2019Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
04/18/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)19-17170
05/06/2019Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDERS this appeal DISMISSED." SNP19-JH/LS/AS. (SC).19-19690
05/31/2019RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)19-23638
05/31/2019Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
07/29/2019RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on June 6, 2019. (SC)19-23638