Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 78604
Short Caption:SMITH (NORMAN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C312289Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/19/2019Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
04/19/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement and Notice of Briefing Schedule mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC)19-17371
05/02/2019Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 01/28/16, 02/08/16, 04/20/16, 09/28/17,10/31/17, 11/30/17, 01/17/18, 02/06/18, 02/12/18, 04/05/18, 04/17/18, 10/18/18, 10/22/18, 10/23/18, 10/24/18, 10/25/18, 10/29/18, 10/30/18, 10/31/18, 01/03/19, 01/22/19, 03/20/19. To Court Reporter: Susie Schofield. (SC)19-19469
05/10/2019Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals. (SC)19-20602
05/29/2019MotionFiled Court Recorder Robin Page's Motion for Extension of Time to File Transcript. (SC)19-23252
06/10/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Court Recorder Robin Page's Certificate of Delivery of Transcripts due: July 8, 2019. (SC)19-25018
07/03/2019TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Robin Page stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 09/27/17, 10/31/17, 11/31/17, 04/17/18, 10/18/18, 01/03/19, 01/22/19, 03/20/19. (SC)19-28566
07/03/2019TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Robin Page stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 10/22/18, 10/23/18, 10/24/18, 10/25/18, 10/29/18, 10/30/18, 10/31/18. (SC)19-28569
08/19/2019MotionFiled Appellant's First Motion to Extend Time for Filing of Opening Brief. (SC)19-34742
08/29/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until October 21, 2019, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix.. (SC)19-36186
10/17/2019Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance as Counsel of Record (Patricia Erickson as counsel for the Appellant). (SC). (STRIKEN PER 11/01/19 ORDER).
10/17/2019Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. (REJECTED PER 10/18/19 NOTICE). (SC).
10/17/2019TranscriptFiled Request For Transcript of Proceedings. (REJECTED PER 10/18/19 NOTICE). (SC).
10/17/2019TranscriptFiled Request For Transcript of Proceedings. (REJECTED PER 10/18/19 NOTICE). (SC).
10/17/2019TranscriptFiled Request For Transcript of Proceedings. (REJECTED PER 10/18/19 NOTICE). (SC).
10/18/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Transcript Request. (SC).19-43255
10/21/2019MotionFiled Appellant's Second Motion to Extend Time for Filing of Opening Brief or in the Alternative to Stay or Toll Time. (SC)19-43575
10/21/2019Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 06/14/17 (Jill Jacoby and/or Sarah Richardson); 10/08/18 (Gina Villani); 02/08/16, 04/20/16, 05/20/16, 10/05/16, 06/05/17 (Lara Corcoran); 06/29/17, 07/27/17, 02/12/18, 04/10/18, 04/26/18, 05/01/18, 08/02/18, 09/27/18 (Susan Schofield and/or Robin Page). (SC)19-43579
10/21/2019MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Additional Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix (First Request). (SC) (STRICKEN PER 11/01/19 ORDER).
10/29/2019TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Gina Villani stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 10/08/18. (SC).19-44413
11/01/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Regarding Motions. Attorney Bret O. Whipple shall remain as counsel of record for appellant, ant the clerk shall strike the notice of appearance filed on October 17, 2019. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: December 20, 2019. The clerk shall strike the motion for extension of time filed by Ms. Erickson on October 21, 2019. (SC).19-45012
11/07/2019Notice/IncomingFiled Substitution of Attorneys (Patricia Erickson to Replace Bret Whipple as counsel for Appellant). (SC).19-45901
11/07/2019MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Additional Time to File Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix (First Request). (SC).19-45902
11/13/2019TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Lara Corcoran stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 02/08/16, 04/20/16, 05/02/16, 10/05/16, 06/05/17.19-46451
11/21/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The clerk of this court shall remove Brett O. Whipple and the Justice Law Center from the docket for this appeal. Attorney Erickson now represents appellant. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: February 18, 2020. (SC).19-47667
12/20/2019TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter Robin Page stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 6/29/17, 7/27/17, 4/10/18, 4/12/18, 4/26/18, 8/2/18, and 9/27/18. (SC)19-51639
02/18/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix (Second Request). (SC)20-06719
02/27/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until May 4, 2020, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. (SC)20-07877
05/05/2020MotionFiled Motion to Late File By One (1) Day and Motion for Additional Time to File Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix 3rd Request. (SC)20-17025
05/13/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until June 4, 2020, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. (SC)20-18261
06/04/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix (Fourth Request) (SC)20-21127
06/11/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix (5th Request). (SC)20-21867
06/22/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motions. Appellant shall have until July 1, 2020, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. (SC)20-23092
07/01/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix (Sixth Request). (SC)20-24509
07/08/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Appellant has now filed a motion for a sixth extension of time of 90 days on the ground that she wishes to meet with appellant. The motion is denied. Appellant shall have 14 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. (SC)20-25236
07/21/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Appellant's Opening Brief Volume I. (SC)20-26608
07/21/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Appellant's Opening Brief Volume II (REJECTED PER 7/21/20 NOTICE). (SC)
07/21/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Appellant's Opening Brief Volume III. (SC)20-26610
07/21/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Appellant's Opening Brief Volume IV. (SC)20-26611
07/21/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Appellant's Opening Brief Volume V. (SC)20-26612
07/21/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Appellant's Opening Brief Volume VI. (SC)20-26613
07/21/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Appendix. Corrected Appendix Volume II due: 5 days. (SC)20-26670
07/22/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Appellant's Opening Brief Vol II. (SC)20-26694
07/22/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service of Appendix to Appellant's Opening Brief Volumes I thru VI. (SC)20-26695
07/23/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)20-26858
07/23/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Late File Appellant's Opening Brief by One (1) Hour and Ten (10) Minutes. (SC)20-26859
07/29/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Despite its untimeliness, appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the opening brief is granted. The opening brief was filed on July 23, 2020. Respondent shall have August 24, 2020, to file and serve the answering brief. (SC)20-27555
08/19/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Respondent's Notice of Appearance (Jonathan E Vanboskerck)(SC)20-30652
08/19/2020BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)20-30654
08/19/2020AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief. (SC)20-30656
09/19/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Appellant's Reply Brief (SC)20-34548
09/30/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's reply brief due: October 19, 2020. (SC)20-35845
10/19/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Reply Brief (Second Request). (SC)20-38316
10/20/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's reply brief due: October 29, 2020. (SC)20-38408
10/29/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time By Two Days to File Reply Brief. (SC)20-39753
11/02/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)20-39937
11/02/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion For an Order Directing the Court Clerk Transmit Court Exhibits 21 and 23. (SC)20-39938
11/05/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's motion requesting a third extension of time to file the reply brief is granted. The reply brief was filed on November 2, 2020. (SC)20-40363
11/05/2020Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
11/12/2020AppendixFiled Received Appellant's Supplemental/Reply Brief Appendix with Exhibits 21 & 23. (FILED SUPPLEMENTAL/REPLY BRIEF APPENDIX AND RETURNED, UNFILED PER ORDER 11/19/20).
11/19/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The clerk of the district court shall have 14 days from the date of this order to transmit to the clerk of this court original videos, Court Exhibits 21 and 23. The clerk of this court shall return, unfiled, the CDs of exhibits 21 and 23 received with appellant's "Supplemental/Reply Brief Appendix" on November 12, 2020. The clerk shall file the 5-page appendix separately. (SC)20-42309
11/19/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Supplemental/Reply Brief Appendix. (SC)20-42318
04/29/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Notice of Voluntary Disclosure. I (Justice Douglas Herndon) have no bias or prejudices as to any of the parties or issues in the litigation and do not believe that my impartiality could reasonably be questioned. However, I make this disclosure so that any person who wishes to request my disqualification may do so by filing a motion pursuant to NRAP 35. Any recusal request should be made in writing within seven (7) days of the filing date of this Voluntary Disclosure. (SC)21-12358
05/14/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." SNP21 - RP/LS/AS (SC)21-13951
06/01/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to Determine Whether to File a Petition for Rehearing. (SC)21-15474
06/02/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until June 16, 2021, to file and serve a petition for rehearing. If no petition for rehearing is filed within this time period, the clerk of this court shall issue the remittitur. (SC)21-15599
06/21/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-17664
06/21/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
07/02/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on June 22, 2021. (SC)21-17664