Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 78613
Short Caption:KADMIRI (JOEY) VS. STATE, DEP'T OF CORR.Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):White Pine Co. - Seventh Judicial District - HC-1903010Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Briefing Completed/Submitted For Decision
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:06/24/2019How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/22/2019Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
04/22/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)19-17596
04/26/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Transmission of Brief and Regarding Briefing. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. Appellant's Opening Brief or Informal Brief due: 120 days. (SC)19-18400
04/29/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal - Volume 1. (SC)19-18583
05/09/2019BriefFiled Proper Person Appellant's Informal Brief. (SC)19-20325
06/24/2019Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/Submitted For Decision. (SC)